Harper v. Federal Prison Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Don Alton Harper
Defendant: Norman S. Rosenthal and P. Urbano
Case Number: 1:2007cv00750
Filed: April 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER denying 206 Motion to Reopen. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/12/2014.(klyon, )
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying 198 Plaintiff's paper captioned "WrongfulDismissal" read as a motion for relief from judgment. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/2/12.(mjgsl, )
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 148 filed 02/09/2010, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. The Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Prisoner Complaint Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) 144 filed 12/23/2009, is GRA NTED. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 157 filed 03/10/2010, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. The plaintiffs On Motion Requesting Leave By This Honorable Court To Grant This Motion Pursuant To the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures Rule 15(a) To Amend 152 filed 02/22/2010, is DENIED. The plaintiffs objections [#153] filed 02/22/2010, and 159 filed 03/25/2010, which address the two recommendations [148 & 157], are OVERRULED AND DENIED. The objections stated in Plaintiffs Object ion To Defendants Misunderstanding for Requesting for Expert Witnesse (sic) Testimony 165 filed 04/12/2010, are OVERRULED AND DENIED. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, Norman S. Rosenthal, M.D. and P. Urbano, against the plaintiff, Donald Alton Harper. The defendants, Norman S. Rosenthal, M.D. and P. Urbano, are AWARDED their costs. This case is DISMISSED and CLOSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/10/2010.(sah, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 175 Notice of Appeal by Don Harper, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/09/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court. (bjrsl, )
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE ORDER. The Memorandum 172 is WITHDRAWN; and the Appellant Petitioner Petition This Court To Issue an Injunction Against B. Gary Counsel 171 was filed 05/14/2010, is DENIED for lack of jurisdiction. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/17/2010.(sah, )
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 149 , filed 02/09/2010, is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court. The objections stated in Plaintiffs Objection To Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge 153 filed 0 2/22/2010, are OVERRULED. The Defendants Motion To Reconsider Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Leave To Proceed In Forma Pauperis 143 filed 12/23/2009, is GRANTED. Under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), the status of the plaintiff as a party permitte d to proceed in forma pauperis in this case is REVOKED. On or before 08/07/2010, the plaintiff SHALL PAY to the Clerk of the Court the remaining balance of the filing fee in this case in the amount of two hundred seven dollars ($207.00). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/07/2010.(sah, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying 160 MOTION for Expert Witnesses Testimony by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/1/2010.(kmtcd, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Minute ORDER granting 145 MOTION to Stay Discovery, MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants. All pending discovery is stayed pending ruling on Defendants motion to dismiss by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/9/2010.(kmtcd, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER denying 141 MOTION to Amend 18 Amended Complaint (actually entitled: Scheduling Order) by Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/29/09.(kmtcd, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Minute ORDER denying 137 MOTION Requesting The List Of Exhibits From A Thur G Entered Into Evidence by Plaintiff Don Alton and 138 MOTION Pursuant to Fed.R.Civil Proc. R. 37, 26 (a)(1) "Exhibits" that Contains The Interrogatory Docs, Exhibits A thru G, by Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/21/09.(kmtcd, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Minute ORDER granting 127 Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Preliminary Scheduling Conference reset for 12/3/2009 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/23/09.(kmtcd)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties need not comply with the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and D .C.Colo.LCivR. 16.2 and 26.1. The purpose of the initial conference is to consider the nature and status of the case, the timing for filing of any motions, and what discovery, if any, will be needed. Plaintiff, or his/her case manager, shall arrange for his/her participation via telephone and shall call (303) 335-2780 at the scheduled time by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/19/09. (kmtcd)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/14/2009. (sah, )
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 4 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 5/2/07.(pap, )
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, and a Prisoner Complaint on the court's current and proper forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/11/2007. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Federal Prison Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman S. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Urbano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Alton Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?