Infant Swimming Research, Inc. v. Faegre & Benson, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Infant Swimming Research, Inc.
Defendant: Faegre & Benson, LLP, Mark Fischer, Judy Heumann, Norman Heumann and Boulder Escrow, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00839
Filed: April 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting 167 Defendants Judy and Norman Heumanns Motion for a Supplemental Order Directing the Payment of their Attorneys Fees and Costs Incurred on Appeal and granting 173 Defendants Judy and Norma Heumanns Amended Motion for Turnover Order Requiring Delivery of Proceeds into the Registry of the Court. Plaintiff is prohibited from taking any action, directly or indirectly, to impair or dispose of its right to receive such proceeds. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/06/2009.(sah, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER The Heumanns shall file their application for attorney fees and costs documented specifically with supporting documentation within 20 days from the date of this Order. Infant Swimming Research, Inc. will have 10 days to respond to the application, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/11/09. (ebs, )
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying 91 Fischers Motion for Protective Order. Discovery cut-off date is extended to and including May 15, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/07/2008.(sah2, ) Modified to create linkage to correct document on 3/31/2008 (sah, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infant Swimming Research, Inc. v. Faegre & Benson, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faegre & Benson, LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fischer
Represented By: Robert W. Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Heumann
Represented By: William D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Heumann
Represented By: William D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Escrow, LLC
Represented By: Barry N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infant Swimming Research, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?