Bretoi v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kim Bretoi
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv00967
Filed: May 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 and this Court's order dated April 1, 2009 121 , and upon a showing of good cause, this case is hereby reopened. Granting 127 Defendant Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company's Unopposed Mot ion to Confirm the Arbitration Award. Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendant Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company and against plaintiff Kim Bretoi with the parties bearing their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/5/10.(ebs, )
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Minute Order the Stipulated Motion to Stay Case for Arbitration is granted and this case shall be administratively closed. Ordered that plaintiff shall file a status report on 09/30/09. Ordered that all settings in this case, including deadlines, conference, and the trial set to begin on 09/14/09 are hereby vacated by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/01/09. (jjh, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer: Status Conference held on 3/31/2009. Withdrawing 48 Motion for Sanctions; Withdrawing 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Withdrawing 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; Withdraw ing 96 Motion for Sanctions; Withdrawing 97 Motion for Ruling; Withdrawing 98 Motion to Stay; Withdrawing 99 Order on Motion in Limine; Withdrawing 117 Motion to Stay. ORDERED: Trial Preparation Conference and Trial are VACATED. Counsel to file Status Report by 9/30/09. (Court Reporter Janet Coppock)(pabcd) Modified on 4/2/2009 to add text regarding Status Report (ebs, ).
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/21/07. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bretoi v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Bretoi
Represented By: Thomas A. Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas Ryan Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?