James River Insurance Company v. Rapid Funding, LLC
Plaintiff: James River Insurance Company
Defendant: Rapid Funding, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv01146
Filed: May 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting 319 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Civil case terminated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/19/13. (alvsl)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER. James Rivers Motion in Limine to Limit Scope of Retrial 292 is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part, consistent with this order. The parties are directed to contact chambers jointly to set a trial date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/29/2012.(sahsl, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting 301 Motion for Recusal, and the judge's file be returned to the clerk to reassign this case by random draw. The Final Trial Preparation Conference, set for 5/4/2012, and the five-day jury trial, set to commence 5/21/2012, are vacated. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/26/12.(mnfsl, )
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting 282 Motion for Order to Release Supersedeas Cash Bond to James River by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/14/11.(bjrsl, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting 276 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Any proceedings to enforce the judgment are stayed pending appeal. The funds deposited by Plaintiff into the registry of the Court shall remain on deposit until further order of this Court, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/28/10.(lyg, )
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying 216 Rapid Fundings Motion to Increase Exemplary Damage Award or in the Alternative Award Double Damages and Attorneys Fees ; granting in part and denying in part 217 Rapid Fundings Motion for Award of Prejudgment Interest; denying [ 220] James Rivers Motion for New Trial; denying 221 James Rivers Motion for a Remittitur ; denying 222 James Rivers Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; granting in part and denying in part 236 Rapid Fundings Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs Motion for Costs; denying 253 James Rivers Request for Oral Argument on its Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/16/2010.(erv, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting 224 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Disposition of Post-Trial Motions and for Entry of Funds Into Registry of Court. The execution of judgment and any proceedings to enforce the judgment are STAYED pending the disposition of James Rivers post-trial motions by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/22/2009.(sah, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Realigning Caption for Trial Purposes Only re: 100 MOTION for Leave to Proceed First and Last at Trial filed by Rapid Funding, LLC by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/18/09. (erv, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christine M. Arguello: granting 153 Defendants Order on Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 156 Defendants Motion in Limine; granting 195 Defendant Supplemental Motion in Limine; It w as ORDERED: That stipulated exhibits 1 through 10, 12 through 18, 20 through 24, 26, 28, 30, 31, 33, 34, 37, 39 through 45, 67, 118, 122, 123, 132, 135, 139, and 140 are admitted into evidence. Jury Trial held on 4/27/2009. (Court Reporter Darlene Martinez.) (erv, ) (Modified on 4/28/2009 to show that these are AMENDED MINUTES)(erv2, ).
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christine M. Arguello: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 134 Rapid Fundings Order on Motion in Limine; GRANTING 144 James River Insurance Companys Unopposed Motion in Limine; GRANTING 145 James River Insurance Companys Unopposed Motion in Limine; DENYING 146 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; DENYING 147 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; DENYING 148 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; DENYING 149 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; GRANTING 150 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; GRANTING 151 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; DENYING 152 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; defe rring ruling on 153 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; DENYING 154 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; DENYING 155 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; DEFFERULING ruling on 156 James River Insurance Com panys Motion in Limine; DENYING 157 James River Insurance Companys Motion in Limine; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 161 James River Insurance Companys Order on Motion in Limine; Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2009. (Court Reporter Darlene Martinez.) (erv, )
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christine M. Arguello: denying 127 Defendant/Counterclaimants Motion in Limine; denying 132 James River Insurance Companys Cross-Motion to to Exclude Testimony Regarding the Cost Approach; Final Pret rial Conference held on 4/17/2009; denying 162 Rapid Funding LLCs Motion to Strike James River Insurance Companys Late Filed Motions in Limine; Continued Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. (Court Reporter Darlene Martinez.) (erv, )
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 70 James Rivers Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants Breach of Contract and Good Faith and Fair Dealing Claims; granting 71 James Rivers Motion for Summary Judgment Defendants Colorado Consumer Protection Act Claim and Rapid Fundings CCPA counterclaim is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; granting 112 James Rivers Motion to Dismiss Defendants Second Amended Counterclaim Pursuant to Colorado General Assembly House Bill 1407 by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/2/09.(erv, )
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 72 James Rivers Motion to Exclude Mr. Millers Testimony and evidence of Mr. Millers opinion on the value of the North Building will be excluded from trial in this matter. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/24/09.(erv, )
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christine M. Arguello: Daubert Hearing held on 2/13/2009.Taking under advisement 72 Motion to Exclude. (Court Reporter Darlene Martinez) (cmacd)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/14/07. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James River Insurance Company v. Rapid Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent Donald Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?