Bell v. No Defendants Named
Petitioner: Terrence Bell
Respondent: No Defendants Named
Case Number: 1:2007cv01210
Filed: June 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER accepting Report and Recommendation 32 . Petitioner's Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 5/15/09.(gms, )
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Plaintiff shall file a notice of change of address within five days ofthe date of any change of address, or this action may be dismissed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 04/17/2009. (sah, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 6 Petitioner's Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied and that this case be dismissed with prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/24/09. (ebs, )
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant has 30 days to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, and to file an Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/7/2007. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. No Defendants Named
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrence Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: No Defendants Named
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?