Barron v. Nafziger
Petitioner: Percy Barron
Respondent: Steven Nafziger
Case Number: 1:2007cv01331
Filed: June 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER APPROVED AND ADOPTED 126 Report and Recommendations; That Plaintiff's objections 130 , filed April 9, 2009, are OVERRULED; denying 89 Plaintiffs Motion for Order; granting 90 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, and this case is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/15/09.(erv, )
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 89 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to filed by Percy Barron, be DENIED, and 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Nafziger, be GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/27/09. (erv, )
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/24/2009. Finding as moot 118 Plaintiffs MOTION for Order to make a legal phone call to the USDC on February 24, 2009 at 10:15 a.m. [Document 118, filed February 17, 2009]. (FTR - Debra Brown.) (kmtcd)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER granting 113 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Clarify Minute Order Dated February 2, 2009 111 . Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 90 shall remain part of the record in this matter, and it will be evaluated on the merits. Exh. A-1 to Defendants Motion for Clarification, Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 89 shall be accepted for filing by the clerk. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/10/09.(erv, )
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 108 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/29/09. (ecm, )
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER granting 104 Motion to Clarify Regarding Order on December 29, 2008. Accordingly, the court accepts Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 90 as a response to Plaintiffs Motion of Dispositive (for Summary Judgment) 89 . by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/23/09.(erv, )
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to file amended pleading within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/6/07. (pap, )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/21/07. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. Nafziger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Percy Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Nafziger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?