Coney v. Zavaras et al
Petitioner: William Sean Coney
Respondent: Aristede Zavaras, Colorado Department of Corrections and Colorado Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2007cv01407
Filed: July 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED re 58 Notice of Appeal by William Coney, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/09/10. (bjrsl, )
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Relief from Judgment or Order Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 60(b), and the claims asserted therein dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, filed July 26, 2010 by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/24/2010.(erv, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED re 43 Notice of Appeal by William Coney, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/25/09. (bjrsl, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER 2 habeas corpus relief will be DENIED. it is ORDERED that claims one, two, three, six, and eight are dismissed as procedurally barred, and claims four, five, and seven are dismissed as meritless. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the habeas corpus application is DENIED and the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear his own costs and attorneys fees. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/3/09. (erv, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOR CLARIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re: 38 State Court Records submitted by the El Paso County Combined Courts in the form of a CD lacks any references to volumes of the trial record. However, the respondents in their answer 22 cite ex tensively to the state court trial record by volume. Therefore, the respondents are directed to file by August 13, 2009, an index of volumes that corresponds with the trial record on the CD submitted by the El Paso County Combined Courts. Accordingl y, it is ORDERED that Respondents shall provide to this court by August 13, 2009, an index of volumes that corresponds to the trial record on the CD submitted by the El Paso County Combined Courts. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of this Court send a copy of this order to both parties and to the clerk of the El Paso County District Court, 270 South Tejon Street, P.O. Box 2980, Colorado Springs, CO 80903. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/6/09. (erv, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER for State Court Record. Respondents to provide court, within 20 days, a complete record of Mr. Coney's trial in El Paso County District Court, 00CR3200.Clerk to mail copy of this order to both parties and to the clerk of the El Paso County District Court, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/26/09. (gmssl, )
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant has 30 days to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 7/3/2007. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coney v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Sean Coney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aristede Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?