Video Professor, Inc. v. John Does 1-100 Featured Case
Plaintiff: Video Professor, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2007cv01726
Filed: August 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2007 Filing 9
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer : Status Conference held on 9/27/2007. Appearance of plaintiff's counsel. No appearance for defendants. Counsel discuss the status of the case with the Court. Mr. Smith advises the Court regarding service of parties to the case. (Court Reporter FTR Bernique Abiakam.) (erv, )
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7
Minute ORDER granting Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Order Authorizing Discovery. Telephonic status conference set 9/27/07 at 11:30 a.m., by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 8/23/07.(gms, )
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer by Judge Daniel. (wydcd, rrk)
August 16, 2007 Filing 4
REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Commissioner of Trademarks. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Video Professor, Inc. v. John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Video Professor, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?