King Mountain Gravel, LLC v. RB Constructors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: King Mountain Gravel, LLC
Defendant: RB Constructors, LLC and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv01949
Filed: September 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 99 Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney Fees. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/30/2009.(sah, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Defendants Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce the Judgment of 08/03/2009. A supersedeas bond in the amount of $248,908.00is APPROVED, subject to revision on resolution of the pending Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney Fees. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/17/2009.(sah, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Stipulation and Order Regarding Custody of Exhibits and/or Depositions signed by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 07/30/2009. (lbush)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King Mountain Gravel, LLC v. RB Constructors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Mountain Gravel, LLC
Represented By: Robert T. Hoban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB Constructors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?