Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. The Vail Corporation
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Vail Corporation, The and Vail Resorts, Inc.
Intervenor: Lisa Marie Cornwell
Case Number: 1:2007cv02035
Filed: September 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Eagle
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Joint Stipulation For Dismissal #190 filed 06/18/2009, is APPROVED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/19/2009.(sah, )
June 18, 2009 Filing 190 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Weese, Charles)
June 2, 2009 Filing 189 CONSENT DECREE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/02/2009. (sah, )
May 29, 2009 Filing 188 STIPULATED JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT DECREE by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell, Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Consent Decree)(Kittle, Rita) (Modified on 6/1/2009 changed to a Motion)(erv, ).
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTE ORDER denying #162 the parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) on or before 06/22/2009. The Motion Hearing set for 05/13/2009 at 9:30 a.m. is vacated. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Response to Intervenors Discovery #162 and EEOCs Motion to Compel Information Withheld Based on Improperly Asserted Privileges #182 are DENIED as moot by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/23/2009.(sah, )
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MINUTE ORDER. This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff EEOCs Motion to Compel Information Withheld Based on Improperly Asserted Privileges #182 04/19/2009 (the Motion). The Motion shall be added to the topics to be addressed at the hearing set for 05/13/2009 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-204. Defendant shall respond to the Motion on or before 05/11/2009 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/20/2009. (sah, )
April 20, 2009 Filing 185 REPLY to Response to Motion re #162 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Deposition Excerpts 30(b)(6) of Defendant, #6 Appendix Collins v. WalMart)(Paddock, Laurie)
April 20, 2009 Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/20/2009. All motions addressing disputes regarding witnesses and exhibits identified in the Final Pretrial Order shall be filed on or before 04/30/2009. Any responses to such Motions shall be filed on or before 05/11/2009. A hearing on motions regarding witnesses and exhibits shall be held on 05/13/2009 at 9:30 a.m. The proposed Final Pretrial Order is not approved. The parties shall submit an AMENDED Final Pretrial Order reflecting the changes to the Proposed Pretrial Order made at the Final Pretrial Conference today at or before NOON on 04/22/2009 (Court Reporter FTR- Kathleen Finney.) (sah, )
April 20, 2009 Filing 183 MEMORANDUM regarding #182 MOTION to Compel Information Withheld Based On Improperly Asserted Privileges filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/20/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
April 19, 2009 Filing 182 MOTION to Compel Information Withheld Based On Improperly Asserted Privileges by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Deposition Excerpts 30(b)(6))(Kittle, Rita)
April 16, 2009 Filing 181 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell, Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Plaintiffs' Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Defendant's Witness List, #3 Appendix C - Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #4 Appendix D - Defendant's Exhibit List)(Kittle, Rita)
April 15, 2009 Filing 180 REPLY to Response to Motion re #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DD, #2 Exhibit EE, #3 Exhibit FF, #4 Exhibit GG, #5 Exhibit HH, #6 Exhibit II, #7 Exhibit JJ, #8 Exhibit KK, #9 Exhibit LL, #10 Exhibit MM, #11 Exhibit NN, #12 Exhibit OO, #13 Exhibit PP)(Weese, Charles)
April 13, 2009 Filing 179 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles William Weese, III (Weese, Charles)
April 7, 2009 Filing 178 REPLY to Response to Motion re #155 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Deposition Excerpts Parker, #3 Appendix Jackson v. Potter)(Kittle, Rita)
April 6, 2009 Filing 177 RESPONSE to Motion re #162 MOTION to Compel Responses to Intervenor's Discovery filed by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Weese, Charles)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MINUTE ORDER granting #172 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Timeto Submit the Parties Proposed Final Pretrial Order. The parties shall submit the Proposed Final Pretrial Order on or before 04/15/2009 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/03/2009.(sah, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER granting #173 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall file its reply in support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment #158 on or before 04/15/2009 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/02/2009.(sah, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM regarding #172 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Submit the Parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order filed by Vail Corporation, The.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/2/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
April 2, 2009 Filing 173 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Weese, Charles)
April 2, 2009 Filing 172 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Submit the Parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Weese, Charles)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #168 Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Joint Summary Judgment Response of Thirty (30) Pages by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/30/2009.(sah, )
March 27, 2009 Filing 170 BRIEF in Opposition re #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6A, #7 Exhibit 6B, #8 Exhibit 7A, #9 Exhibit 7B, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Deposition Excerpts Allen, #28 Deposition Excerpts Brandt, #29 Deposition Excerpts Corcoran, #30 Affidavit Cornwell, #31 Deposition Excerpts Cornwell, #32 Deposition Excerpts Deets, #33 Deposition Excerpts Garcia, #34 Deposition Excerpts Hendry, #35 Deposition Excerpts Kelley, #36 Deposition Excerpts Nell, #37 Deposition Excerpts Riotto, #38 Deposition Excerpts Sapp, #39 Deposition Excerpts Spear, #40 Deposition Excerpts Walljasper, #41 Deposition Excerpts Westenskow)(Kittle, Rita)
March 25, 2009 Filing 169 RESPONSE to Motion re #168 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Summary Judgment Response of Thirty (30) Pages filed by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Weese, Charles)
March 25, 2009 Filing 168 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Summary Judgment Response of Thirty (30) Pages by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Winston, David)
March 23, 2009 Filing 167 RESPONSE to Motion re #155 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF [dkt. # 155] filed by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Weese, Charles)
March 19, 2009 Filing 166 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Discovery Dispute held on 3/19/2009. (Court Reporter FTR - Kathleen Finney.) (klmcd, )
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER granting #164 plaintiffs Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time For Plaintiffs Response To Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment #158 . Plaintiff shall have until 03/26/2009 to file a response to the motion for summary judgment by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/19/2009.(sah, )
March 18, 2009 Filing 164 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Kittle, Rita)
March 17, 2009 Filing 163 MEMORANDUM regarding #162 MOTION to Compel filed by Lisa Marie Cornwell.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/17/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
March 17, 2009 Filing 162 MOTION to Compel by Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Excerpts Franklin, #2 Deposition Excerpts Garcia, #3 Deposition Excerpts Nell, #4 Deposition Excerpts Sapp, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12-1, #17 Exhibit 12-2, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16-1, #22 Exhibit 16-2, #23 Exhibit 17-1, #24 Exhibit 17-2, #25 Exhibit 17-3, #26 Exhibit 17-4, #27 Exhibit 17-5, #28 Exhibit 17-6, #29 Exhibit 17-7, #30 Exhibit 18, #31 Exhibit 19, #32 Exhibit 20, #33 Exhibit 21, #34 Exhibit 22, #35 Exhibit 23, #36 Exhibit 24, #37 Exhibit 25)(Paddock, Laurie)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER. The #123 Order to Show Cause is made ABSOLUTE. Defendant shall submit an affidavit of attorneys fees and costs, if any, relating solely to the Motion for Protective Order, on or before 03/20/2009. Plaintiffs may file an objection to the affidavit on or before 04/03/2009. No further briefing will be permitted by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/06/2009. (sah, )
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/02/2009. (sah, )
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER granting #156 parties' joint Motion for Protective Order. The Stipulated Protective Order is accepted for filing and is entered as an Order of the Court as of the date of the Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/02/2009.(sah, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 158 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC)(Weese, Charles)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM regarding #156 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Vail Corporation, The.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/2/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 156 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Weese, Charles)
March 2, 2009 Filing 155 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Deposition Excerpts Brandt, #13 Deposition Excerpts Garcia, #14 Deposition Excerpts Hendry, #15 Deposition Excerpts Kelley, #16 Affidavit Winner, #17 Appendix EEOC v. DNA SJ Order)(Kittle, Rita)
February 26, 2009 Filing 154 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 02/18/09 before Magistrate Judge Mix. Pages: 1-12. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2009. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER denying #152 Joint Motion To Exceed Page Limits of REB Civ. Practice Standard V.1.4.a by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/25/2009.(sah, )
February 25, 2009 Filing 152 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Weese, Charles)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE ORDER granting #149 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Withdrawalof Lynn L. Palma. Attorney Lynn L. Palma is relieved of any further representation of Plaintiff in the above-captioned matter by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/24/2009.(sah, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM regarding #149 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lynn L. Palma filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/24/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 149 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lynn L. Palma by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Kittle, Rita)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ORDER. Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2009. Proposed Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/13/2009 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/24/2009. (sah, )
February 18, 2009 Filing 147 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Discovery Hearing held on 2/18/2009. (Court Reporter FTR- Kathleen Finney.) (sah, )
February 17, 2009 Filing 146 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Motion Hearing held on 2/17/2009. Defendants oral Motion to Relocate the Deposition is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judge Mix will be available 02/18/2009 by telephone. Court will not disallow the remaking of this Motion, if necessary. Court will relocate these depositions in progress, if necessary. (Court Reporter FTR- Kathleen Finney.) (sah, )
February 16, 2009 Filing 145 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Settlement Conference held on 2/16/2009. No settlement was reached. (klmcd, )
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER. A settlement conference is set for 02/16/2009 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204. Counsel and the parties shall appear in person. On or before 02/11/2009, the parties shall submit updated confidential settlement statements by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/29/2009. (sah, )
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Five (5) Day Jury Trial set for 7/6/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/19/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/20/2009. (sah, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 142 Docket Annotation re: 140 Memorandum, #139 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #135 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition Noticed for January 16, 2009, 136 Memorandum, #141 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Withdraw Document,, 137 Docket Annotation, #138 Order. The NEF's for these documents to Lynn Palma were returned as undeliverable. As she is out on extended leave, the EEOC will file a motion to withdraw. Text only entry - no document attached (gmssl, )
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER granting #139 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Protective Order Regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition Noticed for 01/16/2009 Defendants Motion For Protective Order #135 filed 01/09/2009 is deemed to be WITHDRAWN by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/13/2009.(sah, )
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM regarding #139 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #135 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition Noticed for January 16, 2009 filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/13/09. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
January 12, 2009 Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #135 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition Noticed for January 16, 2009 by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Weese, Charles)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER. On 01/20/2009, at 10:00 a.m., the court shall conduct a telephonic setting conference in order to set this matter for a jury trial and a trial preparation conference by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/12/2009. (sah, )
January 12, 2009 Filing 137 Docket Annotation re: #134 First MOTION for Protective Order Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Court's Order to Show Cause. Created linkage to the Order to Show Cause. Changed docket text to reflect that the motion is indeed a reply. Text only entry - no document attached (sah, )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM regarding #135 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition Noticed for January 16, 2009 filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/12/09. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
January 9, 2009 Filing 135 (WITHDRAWN) MOTION for Protective Order Regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition Noticed for January 16, 2009 by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Barnacle, Colin) Modified on 1/13/2009 to WITHDRAW pursuant to the Minute Order dated 01/13/2009.(sah, ).
January 9, 2009 Filing 134 (REPLY) First MOTION for Protective Order #131 Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Court's Order to Show Cause by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Barnacle, Colin) Modified on 1/12/2009 to create linkage to the Response to the Court's order to Show Cause(sah, ).
December 31, 2008 Filing 133 Docket Annotation re: #131 Response to Order to Show Cause. Entry modified to create linkage to the Order. Text only entry - no document attached (sah, )
December 30, 2008 Filing 132 NOTICE OF DATE OF RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION, PURSUANT TO THE COURTS DECEMBER 3, 2008 ORDER [Dkt 123] AND NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS VIOLATION OF ORDER by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell (Kittle, Rita)
December 30, 2008 Filing 131 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #123 by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Appendix Aventure Comm v. MCI, #10 Appendix Bethel v. US, #11 Appendix Cardenas v. Dorel Juv. Grp, #12 Appendix Flitton v. Primary Res. Mtge, #13 Appendix Gipson v. SW Bell, #14 Appendix Ice Corp v. Hamilton Sundstrand, #15 Appendix Kryszak v. Chase Bank USA, #16 Appendix Lang v. Intrado Inc, #17 Appendix Masse v. Waddington, #18 Appendix Murphy v Cooper Tire, #19 Appendix Purdee v. Pilot Travel Ctrs, #20 Appendix Thibault v. Bellsouth, #21 Appendix Thibault v. Bellsouth)(Kittle, Rita) Modified on 12/31/2008 to create linkage to the order (sah, ).
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER granting #128 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Take Depositions of Robert Kelley and Martin Allen. The parties shall complete the depositions of Robert Kelley and Martin Allen on or before 01/30/2009 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/17/2008.(sah, )
December 17, 2008 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM regarding #128 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Take Depositions of Robert Kelley and Martin Allen filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Lisa Marie Cornwell. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
December 15, 2008 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Take Depositions of Robert Kelley and Martin Allen by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Kittle, Rita)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER granting #125 parties Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions of Three Witnesses. The parties shall complete the depositions of Rich Nell, Rick Garcia, and Dottie Riotto on or before 01/30/2009 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/11/2008.(sah, )
December 11, 2008 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM regarding #125 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Complete Depositions of Three Witnesses filed by Vail Corporation, The, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Lisa Marie Cornwell. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/11/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
December 10, 2008 Filing 125 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Complete Depositions of Three Witnesses by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell, Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Kittle, Rita)
December 3, 2008 Filing 124 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Pursuant to the Order dated 12/03/2008, Discovery due by 1/30/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2009. Show Cause Response due by 12/31/2008. Text only entry - no document attached. (sah, ) Modified on 12/4/2008 to correct the date in which Discovery is due. (sah, ).
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #109 Defendants Motion for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting Scope of the Deposition of Defendants Rule 30(b)(6) Representative. Plaintiffs will proceed at the deposition in the order specified in the list, without exception. The discovery deadline is extended to 01/30/2009 for the sole purpose of completing the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. The dispositive motions deadline is extendedto 02/27/2009. No further extensions of these deadlines will be permitted. Plaintiffs shall show cause, in writing, on or before 12/31/2008, why the Court should not enter an Order requiring them to pay Defendants reasonable expenses incurred in making the Motion, including attorneys fees, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(3) & 37(a)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/03/2008.(sah, )
November 26, 2008 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10-20-08 before Magistrate Judge Mix. Pages: 1-63. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2009. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
November 20, 2008 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #109 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative filed by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Barnacle, Colin)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER granting #118 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order. Defendant shall file its reply in support of Defendants Motion for Protective Order #109 on or before 11/20/2008 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/18/2008.(sah, )
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM regarding #118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #117 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/18/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
November 17, 2008 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #117 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Barnacle, Colin)
November 10, 2008 Filing 117 BRIEF in Opposition re #109 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Deposition Excerpts Brandt, #7 Appendix Cunningham v Standard Fire, #8 Appendix Ice Corp v. Hamilton Sundstrand)(Kittle, Rita)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER granting #114 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for One-Day Extension to Respond to Defendants Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants Motion for Protective Order #109 on or before11/10/2008 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/07/2008.(sah, )
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM regarding #114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Protective Order [Dkt 95] filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Lisa Marie Cornwell. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/7/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
November 7, 2008 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Protective Order [Dkt 95] by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Kittle, Rita)
October 20, 2008 Filing 113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: granting #88 Defendants Motion to Compel; Denying as moot #93 Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Heather Corcoran ; denying #99 Defendants Motion for Protective Order to Prohibit the Continuance ofRichard Nell's Deposition or, in the Alternative, to Limit Scope of RichardNell Deposition; granting in part and denying in part #101 Defendants Motion for Extension of Time; granting #102 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order as Necessary to Allow Discovery Regarding an Alleged Threat Against Intervenor ; granting #103 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Rick Garcia Regarding Late-Produced Records; granting #104 for Leave to Complete Depositions Beyond the Discovery Cutoff Motion for Leave; Motion Hearing held on 10/20/2008 ; Discovery due by 12/15/2008., Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2009., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Court Reporter FTR Kathleen Finney.) (erv, )
October 19, 2008 Filing 112 BRIEF in Opposition re #101 MOTION For Extension of Time for Limited Purpose of Taking Heather Corcoran's Deposition and Continuing Glenn Parker's Deposition, #88 MOTION to Compel INTERVENORS DEPOSITION AND TO EXTEND DEPOSITION DEADLINE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE, #99 MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit the Continuance of Richard Nell's Deposition or, in the Alternative, to Limit Scope of Richard Nell Deposition ; and Proposed Compromise re: Docket Nos. 88, 93, 99, 101, 102, 103, 104; and for Leave to File Response Brief on Docket 109 filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kittle, Rita)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. on Plaintiff's Motions #93 , #102 , #103 , and #104 , by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/16/08. (erv, )
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM regarding #109 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative filed by Vail Corporation, The, #108 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #95 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of MOTION to Withdraw Document re #95 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/16/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
October 15, 2008 Filing 109 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Weese, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Filing 108 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #95 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Weese, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER denying #98 Defendants Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Defendants Motion for Protective Order Quashing 30(b)(6) Notice, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/15/08.(erv, )
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER granting #89 Motion to Seal Exhibit C by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/15/08.(erv, )
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM regarding #101 MOTION For Extension of Time for Limited Purpose of Taking Heather Corcoran's Deposition and Continuing Glenn Parker's Deposition filed by Vail Corporation, The, #103 MOTION for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Rick Garcia Regarding Late-Produced Records filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Lisa Marie Cornwell, #102 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Scheduling Order as Necessary to Allow Discovery Regarding an Alleged Threat Against Intervenor filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Lisa Marie Cornwell, #99 MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit the Continuance of Richard Nell's Deposition or, in the Alternative, to Limit Scope of Richard Nell Deposition filed by Vail Corporation, The, #104 MOTION for Leave to Complete Depositions Beyond the Discovery Cutoff filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Lisa Marie Cornwell, #98 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Quashing 30(b)(6) Notice filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/15/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
October 14, 2008 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Complete Depositions Beyond the Discovery Cutoff by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Kittle, Rita)
October 14, 2008 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Rick Garcia Regarding Late-Produced Records by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kittle, Rita)
October 14, 2008 Filing 102 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #29 Scheduling Order as Necessary to Allow Discovery Regarding an Alleged Threat Against Intervenor by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Excerpts R. Nell)(Kittle, Rita)
October 14, 2008 Filing 101 MOTION For Extension of Time for Limited Purpose of Taking Heather Corcoran's Deposition and Continuing Glenn Parker's Deposition by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Weese, Charles)
October 14, 2008 Filing 100 RESPONSE to Motion re #93 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Heather Corcoran filed by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Weese, Charles)
October 14, 2008 Filing 99 MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit the Continuance of Richard Nell's Deposition or, in the Alternative, to Limit Scope of Richard Nell Deposition by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weese, Charles)
October 14, 2008 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Quashing 30(b)(6) Notice by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Weese, Charles)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER re: #95 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) representative; this motion exceeds 30 pages, Defendant may withdraw its Motion and refile a motion which complies with REB Civ. Practice Standard V.B.1 on or before October 17, 2008. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/10/08. (pap, )
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM regarding #95 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/10/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
October 10, 2008 Filing 95 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Scope of the Deposition of Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Representative by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Barnacle, Colin)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM regarding #93 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Heather Corcoran filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Lisa Marie Cornwell. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/10/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
October 9, 2008 Filing 93 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Heather Corcoran by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kittle, Rita)
October 8, 2008 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM regarding #88 MOTION to Compel INTERVENORS DEPOSITION AND TO EXTEND DEPOSITION DEADLINE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE filed by Vail Corporation, The, #89 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT C TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVENORS DEPOSITION AND TO EXTEND DEPOSITION DEADLINE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/8/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
October 8, 2008 Filing 91 Exhibit C to Defendant's #88 Motion to Compel by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Public Entry for SEALED Document #90 filed 10/8/08) Text Only Entry - No Document Attached(ervsl, )
October 8, 2008 Filing 90 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit C by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Barnacle, Colin)
October 8, 2008 Filing 89 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT C TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVENORS DEPOSITION AND TO EXTEND DEPOSITION DEADLINE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Barnacle, Colin)
October 8, 2008 Filing 88 MOTION to Compel INTERVENORS DEPOSITION AND TO EXTEND DEPOSITION DEADLINE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Barnacle, Colin)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 39 Defendants Motion for Rule 35 Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/2/08.(erv, )
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER granting #82 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Seal Supplement and Reply in Support of Motion for Rule 35 Examination. The Court shall maintain Defendants Supplement and Reply #53 & #83 UNDER SEAL.by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/30/08.(erv, )
September 24, 2008 Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION for Order for Rule 35 Examination Under SEAL filed by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Public Entry for SEALED Document #83 , filed 9/24/08) Text Only Entry-No Document Attached (erv, )
September 24, 2008 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM regarding #82 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Examination filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/24/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(erv, )
September 24, 2008 Filing 83 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G)(Barnacle, Colin)
September 24, 2008 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Examination by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Barnacle, Colin)
September 24, 2008 Filing 81 Docket Annotation re: #80 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Examination. There was an error filing this pleading and the documents to be sealed. It is to be refiled. Text only entry - no document attached (erv, )
September 23, 2008 Filing 80 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Examination by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order for Motion to Seal Reply, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Examination, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G)(Barnacle, Colin) (Modified on 9/24/2008 Reply and Exhibits SEALED as it was filed in error and not under the SEALED Event. Motion has been terminated and will be refiled)(erv, ).
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER granting #75 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Seal Response #76 to Defendants pending Motion for Rule 35 Examination, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/15/08.(erv, )
September 9, 2008 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM regarding #75 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Rule 35 Examination filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Lisa Marie Cornwell. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/9/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
September 8, 2008 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Defendant's 39 MOTION for Rule 35 Examination Filed Under SEAL, filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Public Entry for SEALED Document #76 , filed 9/8/08) Text Only Entry-No Document Attached (erv, )
September 8, 2008 Filing 76 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Kittle, Rita)
September 8, 2008 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Rule 35 Examination by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Affidavit Kittle Declaration, #6 Appendix LeFave v. Symbios)(Kittle, Rita)
September 3, 2008 Filing 74 Utility Resetting Deadlines: Discovery due by 11/13/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 11/24/2008. Text only entry - no document attached. (erv, )
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER granting #71 Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order entered on January 16, 2008 #29 , as modified on August 11, 2008 #65 , is amended as follows: Deadline for Conducting Depositions October 14, 2008; Deadline for Completing Written Discovery November 13, 2008; Dispositive Motions Deadline November 24, 2008; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for propounding written discovery, including requests for admission, is October 14, 2008. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/2/08.(erv, )
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM regarding #71 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #29 Scheduling Order filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/29/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(erv, )
August 29, 2008 Filing 71 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #29 Scheduling Order by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Weese, Charles)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs Response to Defendants [sic] Motion for Rule 35 Order on or vefore 9/8/08 Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants Motion for Rule 35 Examination Docket Nos. [36-2] & 39 . by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/18/08.(erv, )
August 18, 2008 Filing 69 NOTICE re #67 MOTION For Extension of Time for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Order Notice of Unopposed Status by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Kittle, Rita)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM regarding #67 MOTION For Extension of Time for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Order filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/18/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
August 15, 2008 Filing 67 MOTION For Extension of Time for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Order by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Kittle, Rita)
August 11, 2008 Filing 66 Utility Resetting Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/29/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2008. Text only entry - no document attached. (erv, )
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER granting #63 Pla's EEOC and Lisa Marie Cornwells Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadline. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. For good cause shown, the Scheduling Order entered on January 16, 2008 #29 is amended as follows: Discovery Deadline September 29, 2008; Dispositive Motions Deadline November 10, 2008; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for propounding written discovery, including requests for admission, is August 29, 2008. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/11/08.(erv, )
August 11, 2008 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM regarding #63 MOTION For Extension of Time filed by Lisa Marie Cornwell. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/11/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
August 8, 2008 Filing 63 MOTION For Extension of Time by Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Paddock, Laurie)
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting #54 Pla's Partially Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Dfts Motion for Rule 35 Order to on or before 8/18/08 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/5/08.(erv, )
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER granting #58 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Propound Discovery to on or before 8/11/08, and shall respond to any such written discovery on or before 9/10/08, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/5/08.(erv, )
August 4, 2008 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM regarding #58 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Propound Written Discovery filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/4/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(erv, )
August 4, 2008 Filing 59 Docket Annotation re: #56 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Propound Written Discovery. The Motion was not attached, It is to be refiled with the Motion as the Main Document and the Proposed Order as an attachment. Text only entry - no document attached (erv, )
August 4, 2008 Filing 58 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Propound Written Discovery by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Barnacle, Colin)
August 4, 2008 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM regarding #56 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Propound Written Discvoery filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/4/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
August 4, 2008 Filing 56 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Propound Written Discvoery by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Barnacle, Colin)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM regarding #54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Order on Motion to Seal Document, by Plaintiff Intervenor and filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/4/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
August 4, 2008 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Order on Motion to Seal Document, by Plaintiff Intervenor and by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Palma, Lynn)
August 1, 2008 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to 39 MOTION for Order to Motion for Rule 35 Examination by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Barnacle, Colin)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER granting #50 Joint Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Written Discovery. The parties may propound interrogatories and requests for production on or before August 4, 2008, and shall respond to any such written discovery by September 3, 2008. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/28/08.(erv, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM regarding #50 MOTION For Extension of Time filed by Lisa Marie Cornwell. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/28/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 50 MOTION For Extension of Time by Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwell. (Paddock, Laurie)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting #47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Conrad S. Kee terminatedby Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/18/08.(erv, )
July 17, 2008 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM regarding #47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/17/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
July 17, 2008 Filing 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kee, Conrad)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Merrily S. Archer is Withdrawn; granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time, On or before August 4, 2008, Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants Motion for Rule 35 Examination [36-2] & 39 . by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/17/08.(erv, )
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM regarding #44 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Order [Dkt 36] by Plaintiff Intervenor and filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, #43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/17/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
July 16, 2008 Filing 44 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Order #36 by Plaintiff Intervenor and by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Palma, Lynn)
July 16, 2008 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Archer, Merrily)
July 16, 2008 Filing 42 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles William Weese, III on behalf of Vail Corporation, The (Weese, Charles)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting #36 Dfts Unopposed Motion to Seal Rule 35 Examination 39 MOTION for Order to; Defendants Motion for Rule 35 Examination [Docket Nos. 36-2 & 39] and exhibits A through D [Docket Nos. 36-3 through -6 & 39] UNDER SEAL. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/8/08.(erv, )
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding 39 MOTION for Order to filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
June 30, 2008 Filing 38 Docket Annotation re: #36 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document have been SEALED as they were filed in error as attachments to this motion. Text only entry - no document attached (erv, )
June 30, 2008 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM regarding #36 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/30/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
June 27, 2008 Filing 39 MOTION for Order to File Motion for Rule 35 Examination and Exhibits A, B, C, D under seal by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Public Entry for SEALED Documents, #36 , filed 6/27/08) Text Only Entry - NO Document Attached (erv, )
June 27, 2008 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Defendant's Motion for Rule 35 Examination, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kee, Conrad) (Modified on 6/30/2008 All Attachments have been SEALED, they were filed as attachments in error to the Motion)(erv, ).
May 6, 2008 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Settlement Conference held on 5/6/2008. No settlement reached; no record made; conference concluded. (klmcd )
April 17, 2008 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Andrew Winston (Winston, David)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Pla's Unopposed Motion to Reset Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference Reset for 5/6/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/12/08. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(erv, )
March 11, 2008 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM regarding #31 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Settlement Conference filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/11/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(rebsec, )
March 10, 2008 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Winston, David)
January 16, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Conrad S. Kee on behalf of Vail Corporation, The (Kee, Conrad)
January 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/16/08. (erv, )
January 16, 2008 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Scheduling Conference held on 1/16/2008, Settlement Conference set for 4/2/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix., Discovery due by 8/29/2008., Dispositive Motions due by 10/10/2008., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Court Reporter FTR Valeri Barnes.) (erv, )
January 14, 2008 Filing 27 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Archer, Merrily)
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit the parties Proposed Scheduling Order. The parties shall submit their proposed Scheduling Order to the Court on or before January 14, 2008. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/10/08.(erv, )
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Submit Parties' Scheduling Order filed by Vail Corporation, The. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/9/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached) (rebsec, )
January 9, 2008 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Submit Parties' Scheduling Order by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Archer, Merrily)
January 3, 2008 Filing 23 STATEMENT of Disclosure Under F.R.C.P 7.1 and D.C. Colo LCIVR 7.4 by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Archer, Merrily)
January 3, 2008 Filing 22 Defendant's ANSWER to #20 Intervenor Complaint by Vail Corporation, The.(Archer, Merrily)
January 3, 2008 Filing 21 Defendant's ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Vail Corporation, The.(Archer, Merrily)
December 7, 2007 Filing 20 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against The Vail Corporation, filed by Lisa Marie Cornwell.(erv2, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Party Pla by Lisa Marie Cornwell f/k/a Lisa Marie Ansell, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/7/07.(erv2, )
December 4, 2007 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Vail Corporation, The waiver sent on 11/15/2007, answer due 1/14/2008. (Weeks, Nancy)
December 3, 2007 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Lisa Marie Cornwall by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/3/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix (rebsec, )
December 3, 2007 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Lisa Marie Cornwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Intervention)(Paddock, Laurie)
November 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION to Correct Caption re: #6 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant. The caption in this case shall be corrected to name The Vail Corporation as a party defendant by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/23/07.(dln, )
November 23, 2007 Filing 14 Docket Annotation re: #12 Unopposed MOTION to Correct Caption re: #6 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant. [Entry modified to add linkage]. Text only entry - no document attached (dln, )
November 21, 2007 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION to Correct Caption filed by Vail Corporation, The. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/21/07. (erv, )
November 21, 2007 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Correct Caption re: #6 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Archer, Merrily) (Modified on 11/23/2007 to add linkage) (dln, ).
November 19, 2007 Filing 11 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference RESET for 1/16/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix pursuant to Minute Order dated 11/19/07. Text only entry - no document attached. (mrs, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Unopposed #7 Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling/Planning Conference. The Scheduling Conference is RESET to 1/16/08 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A501, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/19/07.(mrs, )
November 19, 2007 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Andrew Winston on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Winston, David)
November 16, 2007 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM regarding #7 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate And Reset Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by Vail Corporation, The by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/16/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix (rebsec, )
November 16, 2007 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate And Reset Scheduling/Planning Conference by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Archer, Merrily)
November 14, 2007 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vail Corporation, The, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Weeks, Nancy)
November 14, 2007 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colin Louis Barnacle on behalf of Vail Resorts, Inc., Vail Corporation, The (Barnacle, Colin)
November 14, 2007 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Merrily S. Archer on behalf of Vail Resorts, Inc., Vail Corporation, The (Archer, Merrily)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2007 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/4/07. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1#2 Attachment 2)(erv, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Blackburn. (rebsec, )
September 28, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Vail Resorts, Inc., Vail Corporation, The Summons Issued, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gms, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. The Vail Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Corporation, The
Represented By: Colin Louis Barnacle
Represented By: Merrily S. Archer
Represented By: Charles William Weese, III
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Louis Barnacle
Represented By: Merrily S. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: David Andrew Winston
Represented By: Lynn L. Palma
Represented By: Nancy A. Weeks
Represented By: Rita Byrnes Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lisa Marie Cornwell
Represented By: Laurie Scott Paddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?