Hills v. Figueroa et al
Petitioner: Jason Hills
Respondent: Fred Figueroa and Colorado Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2007cv02067
Filed: October 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the 3 Application is DENIED and the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear his own costs and attorneys fees. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/3/09. (erv, )
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR STATE COURT RECORD that Respondents shall provide to this Court within ten days from the date of this Order the complete trial transcript record of Mr. Hills criminal case as described above in this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Cle rk of the District Court for Jefferson County produce the records as described in this Order that are in their possession and provide the records to counsel for Respondents, in this case, for filing with this Court. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/12/09. (erv, ) (Modified on 6/12/2009 added State Court Record to title)(erv, ).
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant has 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, and to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action and an Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 on the court's current and proper forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/2/2007. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hills v. Figueroa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fred Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?