Edward v. Dubrish

Plaintiff: Peter Edward
Defendant: Robert E. Dubrish
Case Number: 1:2007cv02116
Filed: October 9, 2007
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 112 MINUTE ORDER denying 111 the Plaintiffs Motion For Clarification,Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/24/2010.(sah, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 110 ORDER. The Plaintiffs Objection, Refusal for Cause, and Motion To Alter or Amend 108 filed 06/25/2009, is DENIED. The Plaintiffs Request for a Hearing on the Motion 109 filed 06/25/2009, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/29/2009.(sah, )
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 106 ORDER. The plaintiffs objections 92 to the magistrate judges recommendation 91 are OVERRULED. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 91 filed 04/15/2009 is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. The Recommendation of Un ited States Magistrate Judge 104 filed05/19/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. Defendant Robert E. Durbishs Third Motion To Dismiss 67 filed 10/23/2008, is GRANTED. Defendant Option One Mortgage Corporations Motion To Dismi ss Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 19 69 filed 10/23/2008, is DENIED. The plaintiffs claims against defendant Robert E. Durbish are DISMISSED under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6). The plaintiffs claims against defendants Option One Mortgage Corporation, Henry J. Pa ulsen, and Michael B. Mukasey are DISMISSED without prejudice under the Younger abstention doctrine. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendant, Robert E. Dubrish, against the plaintiff, Peter Edward a/k/a David Blessing. The defendant, Robert E. Dubrish, is AWARDED his costs to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court under Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(d) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/15/2009.(sah, )
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 104 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. That 69 Defendant Option One Mortgage Corporations Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. [sic] 19 be DENIED, but that this case be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to the Younger abstention doctrine by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/19/2009. (sah, )
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 91 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: that 67 Defendant Robert E. Dubrishs Third Motion to Dismiss 67 be GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/15/2009. (sah, )
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 89 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 53 Plaintiffs Verified Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or in the Alternative, Summary Judgment as Against Defendants Dubrish and Option One Mortgage Corporation by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/13/2009.(sah, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 83 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 82 filed 01/09/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. The Plaintiffs Verified Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 46 filed 07/14/2008, is DENIED by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/06/2009.(sah, )
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 82 RECOMMENDATION of United States Magistrate Judge: that 46 Plaintiffs Verified Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction BE DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/09/2009. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward v. Dubrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Edward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Dubrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?