Higham v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Higham
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv02246
Filed: October 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party to pay his or its own costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/03/09. (jjh, )
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Upon consideration of Defendant's Notice of Settlement, Dismissal Paper due by 11/4/2009. The 4/19/10 trial date is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/21/09. (gms, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 4/19/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/2/2009. (rpmcd)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER for Calendar Call on 10/2/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/23/09. (jjh, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2009 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed 9/16/08 10 , is denied. Case will be placed on the Court's calendar call.(Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higham v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Higham
Represented By: Ryan M. Furniss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?