Krammes v. Romero et al
Plaintiff: Gary Krammes
Defendant: James Romero, Michael Blanck, Bill DeVergie, Mike Bauman, Trevor Balzer and Jason Trousdale
Case Number: 1:2007cv02336
Filed: November 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Gudrun J Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's 131 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is granted. This case is dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorney fees. By Judge John L. Kane on 8/5/11.(mnfsl, )
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER granting 122 Joint Motion to File Jury Instructions Beyond Deadline. The Joint Jury Instructions (doc. # 122 -1) are accepted as timelyfiled, by Judge John L. Kane on 01/26/2011.(wjc, )
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Adopting Recommendation of Magistrate Judge. The 106 Amended Report and Recommendation of U.S. Magistrate Judge is ACCEPTED, and 96 Defendants' Amended Partial Motion (sic) for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment shall enter in favo r of all Defendants on Plaintiff's Third Claim for Relief for false arrest/imprisonment, and in favor of all Defendants except Defendant Balzer on Plaintiff's Fourth Claim for Relief, which I construe as a single claim for excessive force in violation of 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Status Report due by 7/27/2010, by Judge John L. Kane on 07/15/2010.(wjc, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Defendants' Request for Leave to file Amended Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants shall file an Amended Partial Motion for Summary Judgment with a corrected case caption and attorney signature, pursuant to F.C.R.P. 11(a), within 5 days of the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 05/03/2010.(wjc, )
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER striking 80 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 04/27/2010.(wjc, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Adopting 65 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge. The recommendation is adopted and made an order of this court. The State Defendants' 51 Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim is denied as to the second, third and fourth claims for relief, and is granted as to the first and fifth claims for relief, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/24/09.(wjc, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 51 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, that the motion to dismiss be denied as to the second, third and fourth claims for relief, and be granted as to the first and fifth claims for relief, by Magistrate Judge Gudrun J. Rice on 02/06/09. (wjc, ) Modified on 2/10/2009 to add text (wjc, ).
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATIONS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 61 Report and Recommendations. State Defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 01/08/09.(wjc, )
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RECOMMENDATION that the Defendants' 4 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and failure to state a claim and Motion to Stay Proceeding be denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gudrun J Rice on 2/5/08. (sss, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krammes v. Romero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Krammes
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Romero
Represented By: Patricia Dianne Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Blanck
Represented By: Patricia Dianne Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill DeVergie
Represented By: Patricia Dianne Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Bauman
Represented By: Patricia Dianne Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Balzer
Represented By: Patricia Dianne Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Trousdale
Represented By: Patricia Dianne Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?