Fluker v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Dean Fluker
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons, Vikas V. Patel and Patrick Devanny
Case Number: 1:2007cv02426
Filed: November 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. Affirming and adopting Report and Recommendation 111 . Granting 98 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Second Amended Complaint in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Complaint and civil action are dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/22/10.(gmssl, )
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER AFFIRMED and ADOPTED 108 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer Granting 90 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Vikas V. Patel DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/17/2010.(erv, )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying as Unnecessary 84 Mr. Flukers Unopposed Motion for Order to Make Monitor[ed] Legal Telephone Calls to Schedule Doctor Appointments and Retain Expert Witnesses Pursuant to D.C. COLO LCivR 7.1 Motions (A) (b) [sic] by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/29/09.(erv, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2009. ORDERED: Plaintiff's oral motion to withdraw 69 Motion for Order is GRANTED. Doc 69 is WITHDRAWN. Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe.) (cbscd, )
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Status Conference held on 3/10/2009 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. ORDERED: Defendant's oral motion to withdraw Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is granted and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ 48] is withdrawn without prejudice. Plaintiff's oral motion to withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, is granted and doc. 53 is withdrawn. Plaintiff has until March 27, 2009 to file a motion for leave to amend complaint. Plaintiff's Motion for Independent Medical Examination 56 , is denied without prejudice. (Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fluker v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Dean Fluker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vikas V. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Devanny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?