Japan Bio Science Laboratory Co., Ltd. v. N-ZymeCeuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv02635
Filed: December 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: David M. Ebel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part Report and Recommendation 80 . JBSLs Amended Bill of Costs (Dkt. #79) is GRANTED IN PART as recommended by Magistrate Judge Watanabe (Dkt. #80), and that no later than November 20, 2009, N-Zyme shall pay JBSL the sum of $1,656.64 (deposition fees and transcripts fees) as costs. JBSLs request for $1,101.05 (Westlaw charges and counsels travel expenses) is DENIED, by Judge David M. Ebel on 9/29/09.(gmssl, )
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Recommendation Regarding Plaintiff Japan Bio Science Laboratory Company Ltd's Amended Bill of Costs 79 , by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/03/2009. (mjwcd)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER adopting in Part Report and Recommendation 77 and Awarding Attorneys' Fees. JBSLs bill of costs (Dkt. #73) is GRANTED IN PART, as to attorneys fees. No later than 7/15/09, N-Zyme shall pay to JBSL the sum of $6,283.00 in attorneys fees. JBSLs bill of costs is DENIED IN PART, as to nonattorney- fee costs recoverable pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d). JBSL may submit a revised bill of costs and supporting affidavit, only as to non-attorney-fee costs, within 10 days. If JBSL su bmits such a revised bill of costs, it should be reviewed first by Magistrate Judge Watanabe. The court requests a new Recommendation from the magistrate judge on any such revised bill of costs. If no revised bill of costs is submitted within 10 days of the filing of this order, JBSL shall be deemed to have waived any request for non-attorney-fee costs, and the award of $6,283.00 in attorneys fees shall be deemed final, by Judge David M. Ebel on 6/24/09.(gms, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION That 73 Plaintiff's Bill of Costs be granted and that Defendant N-Zyme pay to Plaintiff JBSL the sum of $6,283.00 in attorneys fees and $3,583.00 in costs on or before June 25, 2009, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/9/09. (gms, ) Modified on 6/9/2009 to correct linkage (gms, ).
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation and Granting Default Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(f). Adopting Report and Recommendation 68 full. Default judgment shall enter against N-Zyme in amount of $374,190.00. Prejudgment interest is denied, postjudgment interest shall accrue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. N-Zyme to pay JBSL's reasonable costs, including attorneys' fees. JBSL to submit no later then 5/15/09 documentation of its costs and attorneys' fees. Mag istrate Judge Watanabe to promptly consider this documentation and prepare and submit a report and recommendation re: determination of JBSL's attorneys' fees. JBSL's request for attorneys' fees beyond those specified is denied. N-Zyme's counterclaims against JBSL are dismissed with prejudice in their entirety. This judgment disposes of all remaining issues and claims and case is closed, by Judge David M. Ebel on 4/23/09.(gms, ) Modified on 4/27/2009 tp delete duplicate text (gmssl, ).
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that a default judgment be rendered against the defendant. Clerk to mail this recommendation to defendant's representatives by regular and certified mail to address in the recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/12/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Japan Bio Science Laboratory Co., Ltd. v. N-ZymeCeuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?