Sattar v. Gonzales et al
Case Number: 1:2007cv02698
Filed: December 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MINUTE ORDER granting 260 Joint Motion for Amendment of the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/31/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/10/12.(mnfsl, )
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE ORDER granting 252 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Designate One Additional Potential Expert Witness. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/2/12.(mnfsl, )
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MINUTE ORDER granting 239 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time. Defendants' Answer is accepted as filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the Answer located at Docket No. 239-2, effective as of the date of this Minute Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/18/12.(mnfsl, )
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER. Defendants' 203 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's 214 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. Plaintiff's claims for violation of the Fifth Amendment are dismissed. Plaintiff's claims for violation of the First Amendment, to the extent they are based on the infringement of his free exercise rights, are dismissed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/15/12.(mnfsl, )
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER. The 227 Joint Motion to Stay All Discovery Pending Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint [Dkt. 203] is granted. All further discovery in this matter is stayed pending resolution of Defendants' 203 Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/22/11.(mnfsl, )
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Amended 14 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge Walker D. Miller on 6/27/11. (mnf, )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER. 199 Motion to Stay is denied. 200 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. The deadline for the parties to designate affirmative expert witnesses is extended to 8/16/2011. The deadline for the parties to designate rebuttal expert witnesses is extended to 9/16/2011. Discovery due by 10/14/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/16/11.(mnfsl, )
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE ORDER granting 194 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint and to Join Additional Defendants. Plaintiff's 194 -1 Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint and attached exhibits are accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/9/11.(mnf, )
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SECOND PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/2/2011. (klmcd )
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Status Conference held on 2/22/2011. Defendant's Oral Motion to Withdraw the Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, and therefore the 130 Motion for Summary Judgment is withdrawn without prejudice. Discovery due by 8/22/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2011. (FTR: Emily Seamon) (eseam)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER. 166 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay is granted. This case is stayed pending the entry of an appearance by counsel for Plaintiff. At that time, the Court will set a status conference to establish new case management deadlines. 159 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is denied as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/19/11.(mnf, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying 105 Plaintiffs Motion for Access to Rebuttal Expert Witness by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/23/2010.(klmcd)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER granting 119 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Expert Witness. The Court accepts for filing Defendants' Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Expert Witness [Docket no. 119-3] as of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall file a reply to the Supplemental Response, if any, by 2/15/10, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/1/10.(ebs, )
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER granting 115 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Depose Plaintiff. Defendants shall take the deposition of Plaintiff on February 11, 2010, beginning at 8:30 a.m. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/28/2010.(klmcd)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/20/2009. (klmcd)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER accepting as modified 63 Report and Recommendation. Granting in part and denying in part 25 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Third, Fourth, and Fifth claims for relief are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's First and Second claims remain pending, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 3/6/09.(ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sattar v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?