Andrews v. Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Marie Andrews
Defendant: Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc., Clarion Mortgage Capital, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Attorneys Title Guaranty Fund, Inc., Sandy Tangney and Residential Capital Group
Case Number: 1:2008cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER of Stipulated DISMISSAL. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 7/13/09. (gmssl, )
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 6/24/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/21/2009. (sah, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Minute ORDER granting 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Civil Action. Case remains referred to Magistrate Judge Watanabe, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 5/15/09.(gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Marie Andrews
Represented By: Robert A. Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarion Mortgage Capital
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorneys Title Guaranty Fund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Tangney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Capital Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?