Alexander v. Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated
Plaintiff: Langston G. Alexander
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2008cv00070
Filed: January 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER By 51 order filed May 4, 2009, I awarded Defendant its reasonable attorneys fees and costs and Defendant submitted an itemization of its attorneys fees together with exhibits and affidavits pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.3 and § VII of my Pretrial and Trial Procedures seeking $12,575 in attorneys fees. I find that the claim is reasonable and order that judgment shall enter in favor of the Defendant and against the Plaintiff for attorneys fees in the amount of $12,575. by Judge Walker D. Miller on 8/6/09. (erv, )
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 8/5/09.(gmssl, )
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Response, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 6/1/09.(gms, )
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER accepting Report and Recommendation 34 as modified. Granting in part and denying in part 23 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Injunctive Relief to Prevent Future Frivolous Actions. Case is dismissed with prejudice. Defendant is awarded reasonable attorney fees and costs. Defendant has to 6/1/09 to submit description of fees and expenses. Plaintiff has 20 days to respond, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 5/4/09.(gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Langston G. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?