Nugent et al v. Cassidy
Plaintiff: Stephanie Nugent and Bryan Nugent
Defendant: Meredith S. Cassidy
Case Number: 1:2008cv00085
Filed: January 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying 59 Motion for New Trial, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/27/2009.(rpmcd)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Custody of Exhibits and Depositions. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/22/2009. (rpmcd)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 9/14/2009 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/24/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nugent et al v. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Nugent
Represented By: A. Bruce Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Nugent
Represented By: A. Bruce Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith S. Cassidy
Represented By: Stephen Jerome Hensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?