Llewellyn v. Shearson Financial Network, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glen Llewellyn
Defendant: Shearson Financial Network, Inc., Allstate Home Loans, Inc., Equity Pacific Mortgage, Inc., Kevin E. Rider, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Nomura Credit and Capital, Inc., NCC Servicing, LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc. and Castle, Meinhold & Stawiarski, LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv00179
Filed: January 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' SUBMISSION OF REVISED PRETRIAL MATERIALS: The parties are ORDERED to take the foregoing into account when fulfilling their duty to meet and confer and submit revised pretrial materials, as described in this Court& #039;s 5/8/2015 minute entry (ECF No. 356 ). No later than 5/20/2015, the parties are ORDERED to submit a revised FCRA jury instruction that reflects the scope of the case as described in the order. By Judge William J. Martinez on 5/11/2015. (alowe)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting 331 Defendants' Motion in Limine. By Judge William J. Martinez on 5/5/2015.(alowe)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/28/14. Unopposed Emergency Motion to Vacate and Reschedule May 29, 2014 Final Pretrial Conference and Extend the Deadline to File the Proposed Pretrial Order 318 is GRANTED in part. The Final Pretrial Conference set for May 29, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 6/10/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2014.(lgale)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MINUTE ORDER granting 308 Motion for Discovery. Discovery due by 1/24/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset to 2/10/2014 10:30AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/5/13.(lag)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting 287 Defendants Motion for Limited Reopening ofDiscovery Regarding Plaintiffs Emotional Damages Following Remand. Discovery Deadline reset to 8/30/2013. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 9/30/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge KristenCorrected title of text to ORDER)(ervsl, ).
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on the parties Joint and Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule June 10, 2013 Final Pretrial Conference and Deadline to Submit Proposed Pretrial Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Co nference set for June 10, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/24/2013.(ervsl, )
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MINUTE ORDER granting 283 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule May 29, 2013 Final Pretrial Conference. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/10/2013. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/12/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/1/2013.(ervsl, )
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court now dismisses without prejudice all claims against the two remaining defendants Allstate Home Loans, Inc. d/b/a Allstate Funding, and NCC Servicing, LLC. Therefore, there are no further claims remaining at issue in this action. The Clerk shall enter Final Judgment in this action in accordance with this Order as well as the Court's Opinion and Order on summary judgment. By Judge William J. Martinez on 6/27/11. (mnf, )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 266 OPINION AND ORDER granting 182 CMS Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 247 Ocwen and NCCI's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 264 Ocwen and NCCIs Amended Motion to Strike Declarations by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/16/2011.(erv, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying 239 Plaintiffs Objection to Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference and to February 17, 2011 Minute Order Vacating Same Request for Reconsideration Motion for Reconsideration by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/18/2011.(erv, )
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE ORDER granting 236 Joint Motion to Vacate and Reschedule February 22, 2011 Settlement Conference and will be reset upon joint motion of the parties. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/17/2011.(erv, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MINUTE ORDER Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/3/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/14/2011. (erv, )
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER granting 179 Unopposed Joint Motion to Vacate and Reschedule 06/17/2010 Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 06/17/2010 at 1:30 PM is vacated and reset to 9/13/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/14/2010.(wjc, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTE ORDER granting 169 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery Deadline and the Dispositive Motion Deadline and to Reschedule the Settlement Conference. Discovery due by 3/31/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2010. Settlement Conference is vacated and reset for 6/17/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/8/2010.(klmcd)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Ocwen's 47 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, IN PART, insofar as the FCRA claim against Ocwen is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim, and DENIED IN PART, insofar as t he Complaint adequately states a claim for outrageous conduct and violation of the FDCPA; CM&S's 53 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; Defendant Nomura's 61 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART, insofar as the FCRA claim against Normura is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim, and DENIED IN PART, insofar as the Complaint adequately sates a claim for outrageous conduct and violation of the FDCPA. Mr. Llewellyn may file an Amended Complaint, on the terms set forth, within 14 days of the date of this Order. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/30/09.(msksec, ) Modified on 4/1/2009 to correct filed date (wjc, ).
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER AND OPINION ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION AND DENYING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Adopting Report and Recommendation 106 . Mr. Llewellyn's 94 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment is denied without prejudice as to Defendant Allstate, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/25/09.(msksec, ) Modified on 2/27/2009 to add text and linkage (wjc, ).
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain itscopy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 02/05/08. (jmp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Llewellyn v. Shearson Financial Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Llewellyn
Represented By: John Nathaniel McNamara, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shearson Financial Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Pacific Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin E. Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Credit and Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCC Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle, Meinhold & Stawiarski, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?