Ramon v. Denver, City and County of et al
Plaintiff: Alan Ramon
Defendant: Denver, City and County of, Denver Police Department, Eric Denke, Karl Roller, Aaron Kafer, John Speeze and Michael Anich
Case Number: 1:2008cv00433
Filed: February 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 2/25/2010. Defendants 80 MOTION to Compel and Request for Expenses and Fees is GRANTED in part. The motion is GRANTED insofar as it seeks to compel discovery. A ruling on the request for expenses and fees is HELD IN ABEYANCE. Plaintiff is required to submit full discovery responses on or before March 07, 2010. Further, the plaintiffs is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before March 7, 2 010 why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Defendants shall file a status report on March 08, 2010 advising whether they have received any discovery responses and whether such responses are adequate. Defendants 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery is DENIED for the reasons stated on the record. (FTR - Debra Brown.) (kmtcd, ) (Modified on 3/3/2010 corrected linkage pursuant to 90 Amended Minutes)(erv2, ).
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 27 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third and Fourth Claims of Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6). By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/29/2009.(sah, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/23/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/11/09. (kmtcd)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Claims of Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by John Speeze, Denver, City and County of, Aaron Kafer, Eric Denke, Denver Police Department. This Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants shall file their reply regarding their Motion to Dismiss 27 no later than August 13, 2009. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/13/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramon v. Denver, City and County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Ramon
Represented By: Michael Richard Meaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver, City and County of
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Police Department
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Denke
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Roller
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Kafer
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Speeze
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anich
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?