Bennett v. El Paso, County of et al
Plaintiff: Jiles Theron Bennett
Defendant: El Paso, County of, El Paso County Sheriffs Office, Terry (I) Maketa, Terry Maketa, Jerome (I) Mercado-Vargas and Jerome Mercado-Vargas
Case Number: 1:2008cv00543
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER of Dismissal, With Prejudice. Each party to pay their own costs and fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/31/09. (jjh, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER of Partial Dismissal with Prejudice 58 . Ordered that defendants Jerome Mercado-Vargas individually and in his capacity of Deputy Sheriff of El Paso County, and Terry Maketa, individually and in his capacity of Sheriff of El Paso County, Colorado are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay his own costs and fees, reserving to plaintiff his claims against the remaining defendant, Office of El Paso County Sheriff by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/21/09.(jjh, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Setting Trial Date: Trial to jury set for January 11, 2010, with counsel to be present at 8:30 a.m., and proposed final pretrial order delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. December 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/28/2009. (rpmcd)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Withdrawing Defendants' 33 Motion to Compel and Vacating the April 1, 2009 Hearing. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/27/2009. Terminating re: 39 Motion to Withdraw. (rpmcd)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 re: 31 Protective Order. All court filings, counsel shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under seal based on the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/13/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. El Paso, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiles Theron Bennett
Represented By: Richard L. Tegtmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso, County of
Represented By: Andrew Coleman Gorgey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: Andrew Coleman Gorgey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry (I) Maketa
Represented By: Andrew Coleman Gorgey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Maketa
Represented By: Andrew Coleman Gorgey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome (I) Mercado-Vargas
Represented By: Andrew Coleman Gorgey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Mercado-Vargas
Represented By: Andrew Coleman Gorgey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?