Western Retek Distributors, Inc. v. Crushtek, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Western Retek Distributors, Inc.
Defendant: Crushtek, LLC and Johann Schmidt
Case Number: 1:2008cv00664
Filed: April 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to Submit Original Promissory Note and for Entry of Judgment. Ordered that counsel for the plaintiff will submit the original promissory note to the Clerk's Office to be stamped "Merged in Judgment". Ordered that judgment will en ter in favor of Western Retek Distributors, Inc. and against Johann Schmidt personally and jointly in the amount of $1,250,000.00 prejudgment interest in the amount of $1,547,845, attorney fees in the amount of $7,215.00 and costs in the amount of $223.17. Ordered that the post judgment interest is awarded at the statutory rate set at the time the judgment is entered upon delivery of the promissory note by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 05/04/09. (jjh, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Declaring Default. Ordered that the pleadings previsously filed for the defendants herein are stricken and the defendants are declared in default. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/05/09.(jjh, )
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER The filing identified as "Show Cause" 25 is stricken. Defendants Crushtek, LLC, and Johann Schmidt shall respond to the motion to compel, filed February 4, 2009, on or before February 27, 2009, failing in which the defendants pleadings shall be stricken and the defendants declared in default, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/24/09. (gmssl, )
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Charles Barton Dunn terminated. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 01/21/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Retek Distributors, Inc. v. Crushtek, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Retek Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Edward S. Waitkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crushtek, LLC
Represented By: Charles Barton Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johann Schmidt
Represented By: Charles Barton Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?