Waggener v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Waggener
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2008cv00715
Filed: April 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees of $6,468.13, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/10.(gmssl, )
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 26 Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/22/10.(gmssl, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Order Approving Stipulation of Award of Attorney Fees Under the Equal Acces to Justice Act. Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $7,000.00. Payment shall be made to plaintiff in care of plaintiff's attorney. Denying as moot 23 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Attorney Fees, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/20/09.(gmssl, )
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying plaintiff's 21 Opposed Motion for Another ALJ on Remand by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/21/09.(lam, )
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Conclusion of the Commissioner through the Administrative Law Judge that plaintiff was not disabled is reversed. Case is remanded to the ALJ as directed in the order, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/15/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waggener v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Waggener
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?