Dalcour et al v. Gillespie et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Dalcour and Jurita Avril
Defendant: Lakewood, City of, Ron Burns, Jennifer Gillespie, Michelle Jordan, Marissa Cordova, John Griffith, James R. Jones, Kristopher Deroehn, Scott Weichert, Patricia Buddy and Shannon Martinez
Case Number: 1:2008cv00747
Filed: April 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting 313 Joint Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/20/15.(dkals, )
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 OPINION AND ORDER ADDRESSING SCOPE OF INJURIES SUBJECT TO REDRESS AT TRIAL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/14/13. (msklc2, )
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Minute Entry for Jury Trial - Day 1 proceedings held before Judge Sterling Johnson. In re: 251 AMENDED minutes to include additional jury selection information. (Court Reporter: Adrienne Whitlow)(babia) Modified on 2/9/2011 to create linkage(sah, ).
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Defendant Patricia Buddy's Motion for Summary Judgment 191 is GRANTED. The Plaintiff's remaining claims against Mr. Buddy are BARRED BY QUALIFIED IMMUNITY. Defendant Buddy's Motion in Limine 208 is DENIED AS MOOT. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/7/10.(msksec, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING AS MOOT REMAINING ISSUES OF RULE 702 MOTION. The Lakewood Defendants 147 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Summary judgment hereby enters in favor of the City of Lakewood and Ron Burns on all claims. The Plaintiffs unconstitutional search claim and the Plaintiffs parental rights claims against the Police Officers in their individual capacities are BARRED BY QUALIFIED IMMUNITY. As to the Police Off icers, the Plaintiffs remaining claims are for unconstitutional seizure and the use of excessive force. The Parties 150 Joint Motion Under Rule 702 Regarding Testimony of Roger L. Willard is DENIED AS MOOT with respect to Opinions 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 9, and 10, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/04/2009.(wjc, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting 171 Defendant Patricia Buddy's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The previously ordered stay of discovery is lifted. Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2009, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/23/2009.(wjc, )
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE ORDER denying as unnecessary 176 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Scheduling Order. Upon completion of briefing of Motion No. 171, and if the motion is granted, the Court will set a deadline for Defendant Buddys dispositive motion to be filed. Until such time as Motion No. 171 is ruled upon, Defendant Buddy shall not file any dispositive motions. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/02/2009.(klmcd)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Evidentiary Hearing held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/16/2009. ORDER: With regard to 150 Parties' Joint Motion Under Fed. R. Evid. 702 Regarding the Testimony of Roger L. Willard: (1) The parties m ay file briefs on the Specht v. Jensen issue by November 5, 2009. (2) Ruling is reserved on Opinions 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 9, and 10. (3) The first part of Opinion 8 is admissible, the second part is not. (4) Opinion 11 is admissible. (Court Reporter Paul Zuckerman) (lbush)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS: Defendant Patricia Buddy's 109 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs' official capacity claims against Ms. Buddy are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' indivi dual capacity excessive force claim and familial association/parental rights claim against Ms. Buddy are BARRED BY QUALIFIED IMMUNITY. Ms. Buddy's 144 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/30/2009.(msksec, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 129 Lakewood Defendants Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Sign Authorizations for Release of Medical Information, or, in the Alternative to Enforce Subpoenas as set forth in Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/15/09.(wjc, )
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER granting 131 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/22/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2009. No further extensions of these deadlines shall be permitted, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/09/09.(wjc, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER granting 125 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/17/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2009, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/05/09.(wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalcour et al v. Gillespie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Dalcour
Represented By: Michael John Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jurita Avril
Represented By: Michael John Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood, City of
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Burns
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Gillespie
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Jordan
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Cordova
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Griffith
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Jones
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Deroehn
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Weichert
Represented By: Katherine M. L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Buddy
Represented By: Patricia Wonsiewicz Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?