Buckner v. Conrad
Plaintiff: Judith Buckner
Defendant: David Conrad
Case Number: 1:2008cv01034
Filed: May 16, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 59 filed 06/24/2009 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 07/31/2009, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 08/24/2009, is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/24/2009. (sah, )
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. The Defendant's Motion to Compel 50 is GRANTED. The plaintiff shall execute and deliver to the defendant, on or before 06/03/2009, releases enabling the defendant to obtain plaintiffs employment records for all employment held subsequent to her employment with the City of Westminster by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/27/2009. (sah, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. The plaintiffs substitute exhibit list 45 is accepted forfiling and adopted as a part of the Final Pretrial Order 46 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Reconsider 47 is DENIED as withdrawn by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/22/2009. (sah, )
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. The parties shall submit a revised proposed final pretrial order on or before 05/11/2009, modified as discussed at the conference this morning by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/04/2009. (sah, )
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 35 Unopposed Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff-Intervenor, The City of Westminister, From the Case. Plaintiff-intervenor, City of Westminister is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/23/2009.(sah, )
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 34 plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to File Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/21/2009.(sah, )
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff Buckners Motion For Leave To File Response Out of Time. Plaintiff Buckners Response To Defendants Motion to Strike Officer Robert DeHerrerea [#29-3], attached to the motion, is accepted for filing by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/27/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckner v. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Buckner
Represented By: Mark Douglas Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Conrad
Represented By: Rebecca Kirsten Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?