Parks v. Zassada et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott Parks
Defendant: Eric Zassada, Andrew Saldivor and Mike O'Connor
Case Number: 1:2008cv01037
Filed: May 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to be responsible for his own costs and attorney fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/4/2010. (erv, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATES re: 82 Notice of Settlement filed by Eric Zassada, the Final Trial Preparation Conference, set for February 26, 2010,and the three-day jury trial, set to commence March 15, 2010, are hereby VACATED. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/22/2010. (erv, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 71 Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Accordingly, the sole remaining claim in this case is Plaintiffs Fourth Amendment search and seizure claim against Officer Zasada. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/16/2010.(erv, )
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/1/2009. Order to Show Cause is vacated. It is ordered granting 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Plaintiff shall file Second Amended Complaint by 7/10/2009, and Defendants are granted leave to file any objections. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd )
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER denying 45 Plaintiffs Motion for Order. It is the responsibility of the Plaintiff to locate and serve Defendant Andrew Saldivor. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/29/09.(erv, )
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Defendants Motion to Amend Order Regarding Fed. R.Civ. P. 26(f) Conference. This court is allowing the Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on February 24, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/11/09.(erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. Zassada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Zassada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saldivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?