Fox v. California Franchise Tax Board et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Fox
Defendant: California Franchise Tax Board, John (I) Chiang, John Chiang, Rick (I) Ward, Rick Ward, (I) Joyce, Joyce, Sue (I) Ying, Sue Ying, Alliance 1, Bob (I) Mauch, Bob Mauch, Orange County Teachers Federal Credit Union, Lisa (I) Mitchell, Lisa Mitchell, Rosie (I) Taylor, Rosie Taylor, (I) Fabby, Fabby, Superior Court of California, Orange Co. Division and Steven Sherman
Case Number: 1:2008cv01047
Filed: May 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff's 25 Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/23/10. (ebs, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Venue. On or before 10/12/2010 plaintiff shall show cause why he has failed to serve the remaining defendants in the manner and within the time limits provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/29/10.(ebs, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying 94 Plaintiff Jeffrey D. Fox's Motion to Amend Judgment. Denying 95 Motion to Amend or Alter Court Order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e). Accepting 84 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Deny ing without prejudice 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Denying without prejudice 59 Motion to Amend Complaint (#4) Rule 15(a). The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 82 is accepted as to its recommendation concerni ng plaintiff's second and seventh claims for relief against defendant AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc. The Court grants that portion of defendant AllianceOnes Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) 39 concerning plaintiff Jeffrey D. Foxs second and seventh claims for relief against AllianceOne. The Court takes that portion of AllianceOnes Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) 39 concerni ng plaintiffs first claim for relief under advisement until such time as plaintiff is allowed to file a second amended complaint that supplements such claim. If the Court denies supplementation of the first claim for relief through a second amended complaint, the Court will issue a ruling on the motion to dismiss the first claim at that time. Plaintiff's objection to the Order 90 of the assigned United States Magistrate Judge concerning his Motion in Limine-Objection to Evidence 51 is overruled, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/5/2010.(ebs, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER accepting 81 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting 46 Credit Union Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, converted to a motion for summary judgment. The Clerk shall forthwith enter judgment in favor of defendants SchoolsFirst Federal Credit Union, Lisa Mitchell, and Fabiola Guillen and against plaintiff Jeffrey D. Fox, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/09.(ebs, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 55 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend Complaint and 59 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend Complaint (#4) (Rule 15(a)) be denied without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/24/09. (ebs, ) Modified on 10/1/2009 to reactivate motion as the case was closed in error (ebs, ).
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 46 Credit Union Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint be granted and that the claims against them be dismissed with prejudice as barred by the doctrine of res judicata, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/16/09. (ebs, )
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 43 Defendants County of Orange - California, Board of Supervisors; Thomas G Mauk, CEO - County of Orange, California; John M. W. Moorlach; Patricia C. Bates; Janet Nguyen; Bill Campbell; and Chris Norbys Notice of Mot ion and MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, be GRANTED and that all claims against defendants County of Orange - California, Board of Supervisors; Thomas G Mauk, CEO - County of Orange, California; John M. W. Moorlach; Patricia C. Bates; Janet Nguyen; Bill Campbell; and Chris Norby be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/14/09. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. California Franchise Tax Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick (I) Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue (I) Ying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Ying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob (I) Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Mauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Teachers Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa (I) Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie (I) Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Fabby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of California, Orange Co. Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?