Kentz v. Borja et al
Plaintiff: Charles Lowell Kentz
Defendant: Borja and (I) Borja
Case Number: 1:2008cv01064
Filed: May 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER APPROVED AND ADOPTED 46 Report and Recommendations on Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 29 Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction converted to a motion for summary judgment. That JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defen dants, Lieutenant Borja and Lieutenant Molina, against the plaintiff, Charles Lowell Kentz, on each of the plaintiffs claims for relief; That the defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1; and That this case is DISMISSED by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/21/09.(erv, )
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RECOMMENDATION ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: that 29 Defendants Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), which has been converted to a Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 BE GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/11/2009. (sah, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF CONVERSION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Defendants have filed a Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Motion), alleging that Plaintiff fails to state a claim against the Defendant upon which relief may be granted 29 . Plaintiff timely filed a response with amendments and Defendants a reply. any additional briefing by either party must be submitted on or before 03/06/2009 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/20/2009. (sah, )
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Defendants may file a reply to the Plaintiffs response and supplemental opposition brief on or before 02/10/2009 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/28/2009.(sah, )
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 34 Defendants unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery. All discovery is hereby stayed in this case pending the District Courts ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss. The Court hereby vacates the Status Conferencescheduled in this case for 01/29/2009, at 9:15 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/26/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kentz v. Borja et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lowell Kentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Borja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?