Bellco Credit Union v. USA
Plaintiff: Bellco Credit Union
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2008cv01071
Filed: May 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Taxes Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 170 Plaintiffs Amended Motion that Court Officially Publish Its Opinions. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/28/2010.(erv, )
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Regarding Custody of Exhibits and Depositions by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/8/09. (erv, )
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 119 Plaintiff Bellco Credit Unions Motion to Bifurcate Issues of Liability from Computation Issues and Limit December 7 Trial to Issues of Liability. The trial in this matter shall be limited to issues of liability. Subsequent to the Courts decision on the issue of liability, the Court will consult with the parties regarding the most efficient and expedient manner of resolving any outstanding computational issues. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/1/09.(erv, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER G ranting in part and Denying in part 62 Bellcos Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in part and Denying in part 69 The United States Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 105 Bellcos Motion to Withdraw Jury Demand. The remaining issues in this case shall be tried to the Court. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/12/09.(erv, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER The Motion to Unseal is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the United States Motion for Summary Judgment 66 is UNSEALED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Declaration of Shayla McCormally in Support of the United States Motion for S ummary Judgment 67 and the attachments thereto, excluding Exhibit C-1 (Doc. # 67-6), Exhibit C-2 (Doc. # 67-7), and Exhibit C-3 (Doc. # 67-8), are UNSEALED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that originally filed Exhibit C-1 [67-6] Exhibit C-2 [67-7], and Exhibit C- 3 [67-8] shall REMAIN UNDER SEAL. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/28/09.(erv, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL Five Day Jury Trial set for 12/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/20/2009 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/14/09. (erv, )
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Motion to Withdraw Document; withdrawing 40 Motion to Expedite; withdrawing 40 Motion to Compel by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/30/09.(erv, )
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Motion to Withdraw Document; withdrawing 38 Motion to Expedite; withdrawing 38 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/11/09.(erv, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/20/09.(erv, )
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 15 Defendants Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay. Signed by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/27/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellco Credit Union v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellco Credit Union
Represented By: Michael M. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?