July 30, 2009 |
Filing
143
ORDER. The Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 80 filed 04/30/2009, is GRANTED. The plaintiffs first claim for relief, alleging race discrimination under 42 U.S.C. § 1981, is DISMISSED with prejudice. The plaintiffs second claim for relie f, alleging retaliation under 42 U.S.C. § 1981, is DISMISSED with prejudice. The plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counterclaim 67 is DENIED as moot, in light of the defendants notice of dismissal 90 . JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of t he defendants, Dean Foods Company, A Delaware Corporation, Dean West, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Corporation, Southern Foods Group, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company Doing Business as Meadow Gold Dairy, against the plaintiff, Mary Robinson. The defendants are AWARDED their costs. This case is CLOSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/30/2009.(sah, )
|
July 1, 2009 |
Filing
101
COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2009. ORDERED: 96 Motion by Defendant Southern Foods Group, LLC for Entry of Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED I N PART. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent that it requires the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition to take place in Dallas, Texas. The subject of the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition shall be limited to the facts implicated by the third and fourth claims for relief . The Motion for Protective Order is DENIED to the extent it seeks to conduct or to preclude the deposition to be given on a specific day. Counsel for the parties shall confer and set a date that is reasonably acceptable to them and to the deponent. To the extent that the Motion is construed as asking the court for a ruling in advance, the Motion is DENIED. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
|
May 29, 2009 |
Filing
85
COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2009. ORDERED - Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Her Complaint 70 is GRANTED. In granting this Motion, the court is not e xpressing any views on the merits of Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) arguments and not restricting, in any way, the Defendants' right to assert the same arguments in a motion under Rule 12(b)(6). The parties may file objections within ten days o f today's date. ORDERED - The court will allow the Defendants to reopen Plaintiff's deposition to specifically address the newly asserted claims. The court will allow the Plaintiff to conduct a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition for the limited purpose of obtaining discovery relative to the new claim. Depositions shall be completed no later than July 1, 2009. ORDERED - The final pretrial conference remains set for July 21, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing
77
MINUTE ORDER granting 76 defendants Motion Seeking Clarification From The Court Regarding 03/19/2009 Sanctions Order. The defendants request for an extension of time to file a statement of excess costs, expenses, and attorney fees is GRANTED. This statement shall be filed on or before 04/28/2009 by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/20/2009.(sah, )
|
March 19, 2009 |
Filing
65
ORDER. The defendants Motion for Sanctions 19 filed 08/18/2008, is GRANTED in part. Under 28 U.S.C. § 1927, the defendants are AWARDED their excess costs, expenses, and attorney fees reasonably incurred. The courts award of excess costs, expen ses, and attorney fees SHALL BE PAID to the defendants by Kent P. Long. The courts award of excess costs, expenses, and attorney fees SHALL BE PAID to the defendants by Kent P. Long. The defendants Motion for Sanctions 19 , filed 08/18/22008, is DENIED otherwise by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/18/2009.(sah, )
|
March 18, 2009 |
Filing
64
ORDER. The defendants Motion To Dismiss 4 filed 07/03/2008, is DENIED as moot; and the defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Mary Robinsons Amended Complaint 30 filed 09/10/2008, is DENIED by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/18/2009.(sah, )
|