USA v. Silva Ranch et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Silva Ranch, Claudia A. Silva, Debra A. Caldeira, Stanley W. Silva, Ernest J. Caldeira, Silva Ranch and Cattle Company, Mountain View Electric Association, Inc., James A. Mundt, Paragon Financial Investors, LLC, Farmers State Bank of Calhan, Treasurer of Elbert County, Colorado, Harmony Land and Cattle Company and All Unknown Persons Who Claim Interest in the Subject Matter of This Action
Case Number: 1:2008cv01281
Filed: June 16, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Elbert
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Replevin & Conversion

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 90 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting 88 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the Second Claim for Relief and the Third Claim for Relief Alleged in the Complaint by Plaintiff United States; Plaintiffs second and third claims for relief are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Since no claims remain in this case, it is hereby DISMISSED. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/21/2010.(erv, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 82 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Mix; granting 66 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in favor of the United States of America against Defendants Claudia Silva and Stanley Silva as to the first claim for relief, which requests that the Court quiet title in and to an expressed easement. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/6/2010.(erv, )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Claudia Silva and Defendant Stanley Silva filed by USA, BE GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/7/09. (erv, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause re: 78 Order to Show Cause, The Plaintiff has complied with the Courts Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/17/09. (erv, )
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Set Aside 63 Clerk's Entry of Default of Defendant Harmony Land and Cattle Company by Plaintiff United States and Defendant Harmony Land and Cattle Company by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/3/09.(erv, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 69 Joint Motion to Set Aside 65 Clerk's Entry of Default by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/30/09.(erv, )
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The original complaint 1 is deemed to be amended by striking the existing paragraph 52 and replacing it with the following language: The Public Trustees Deed was recorded on October 15, 1985, at Reception No. 262719, Book 385, Page 866 in the Clerk of Recorders Office for Elbert County, Colorado. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/7/09.(erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Silva Ranch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silva Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia A. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. Caldeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley W. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest J. Caldeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silva Ranch and Cattle Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain View Electric Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Mundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Financial Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers State Bank of Calhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer of Elbert County, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmony Land and Cattle Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Unknown Persons Who Claim Interest in the Subject Matter of This Action
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?