Amkor Natural Gas Company v. Spark Energy Gas, LP
Case Number: 1:2008cv01291
Filed: June 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Granting Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. The Court being fully advised in the premises, hereby ORDERS that this case and all claims and counterclaims are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 09/08/10. (jjh, )
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2010 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Motion to Modify Subpoena Duces Tecum and for Protective Order, filed March 24, 2010 145 , is granted. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 9/20/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/22/2010. (rpmcd)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting 137 Joint Motion to Amend the 114 Scheduling Order and Extend Discovery Deadlines submitted by the Parties. Discovery due by 4/6/2010 (see Order for other deadlines and terms modified), signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/14/2010.(rpmcd)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Striking re: 133 Order Denying Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Said order is stricken from the docket, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/5/2010. (rpmcd)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 126 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Tasha Power. Tasha Power has no further responsibility as counsel in this action by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/30/09.(jjh, )
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Status Conference held on 7/15/2009 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Claims by Spark Energy Gas LP, Against Rhett C. Shumway and RND Energy, LLC, filed J uly 8, 2009 90 is approved. Plaintiff Amkor Natural Gas Co.'s and Additional Counterclaim Defendant Michael Gregory's Motion for Summary Judgment as To Liability on Amkor's Claims and Dismissing Spark Energy Gas, LP's Countercla ims, filed July 2, 2009 86 , is denied in part and Spark Energy Gas, LP will file a response to the remainder of the motion which is limited to the relationship between Amkor and Spark Energy by August 4, 2009. Plaintiff permitted to file a reply. Spark Energy Gas, LPs Motion to Continue Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56(f), filed July 14, 2009 94 , is resolved pursuant to Court's ruling. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 5/19/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/01/09. (jjh, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 3/31/2009 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Spark's Energy Gas, LPs Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint, filed January 26, 2009 41 , is granted. All counterclaims no third party complaint. Sparks Energy Gas, LP's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, filed March 27, 2009 58 , is granted. Counsel to submit in paper format directly to chambers a proposed scheduling order, that focuses on the relationships andholds off on damage discovery, by 4:00 p.m., April 10, 2009. No expert witness discovery permitted. No subpoenas permitted to be served regarding third-party discovery. Third-Party Defendant Asgard Energy, LLC's Joinder in Third-PartyDefendant Rhett C. Shumway and RnD Energy, LLC's Response to Spark Energy Gas, LP's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, filed March 30, 2009 61 , is granted. Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Discovery, fi led January 29, 2009 42 , is moot. Third Party Defendant Rhett C. Shumway and RnD Energy, LLC's Joinder in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint, filed February 17, 2009 [ 50], is denied. Amkor Natural Gas Company and Michael Gregory s Motion to StrikeSpark Natural Gas, LP's Impermissible Filing of Its Third Amended Counterclaims and Third Amended Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint, filed February 17, 2009 [5 1], is denied. Third- Party Defendants Rhett C. Shumway and RnD Energy, LLCs Joinder in Defendants Amkor Natural Gas Company and Michael Gregorys Motion to Strike Spark Natural Gas, LP's Impermissible Filing of its Third Amended Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint, filed February 18, 2009 52 , is denied. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki.) (rpmcd)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Amend the Verified Complaint. The Amened Complaint and Third-Party Counterclaim attached thereto is accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 01/21/09.(jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amkor Natural Gas Company v. Spark Energy Gas, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?