Colorado Environmental Coalition et al v. Kempthorne et al
Plaintiff: Wilderness Workshop, Wilderness Society, The, Sierra Club, Rock the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Counsel, National Wildlife Federation, Center for Native Ecosystems, Colorado Environmental Coalition, Colorado Mountain Club and Colorado Trout Unlimited
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne, Bureau of Land Management, Sally Wisely and Jamie L. Connell
Case Number: 1:2008cv01460
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 OPINION AND ORDER VACATING AND REMANDING AGENCY DETERMINATION. The Court SETS ASIDE the decision embodied in the RMP/EIS and REMANDS the action to the BLM for further action in accordance with the discussion herein. The Court having resolved the dispute framed by the parties, the Clerk of the Court shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 06/22/2012. (wjcsl, )
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE ORDER granting 214 Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Caption. The Clerk of Court is instructed to amend the name of Intervenor Defendant Williams Production RMT Company on the docket to WPX Energy Rocky Mountain, LLC. The full case caption shall reflect the new name in all future filings, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/19/2012.(wjcsl, )
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MINUTE ORDER granting 206 Unopposed Motion to Amend Caption. Clerk to amend the name of the plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/19/12.(gmssl, )
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Directing Oral Argument: The parties shall contact chambers to set oral argument on the issues identified herein. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/23/11. (msklc2, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER denying 124 Intervenor-Defendant OXY's Unopposed Motion to Clarify 10/15/09 Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/09.(gmssl, )
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER denying 119 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify 9/2/09 Order and denying 121 Intervenor Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Modify 9/2/09 Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/15/09.(gms, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Public Documents and denying 68 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Extra-Record Materials without prejudice as standalone motions. Court will treat the briefing re: these motions as supplements to parties' brief on the merits and will address those issues in its ruling on the merits, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/29/09.(gms, )
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER granting 115 Defendants' Motion to Modify Order Dated 9/2/09. Counsel for defendants to appear on person at settlement conference on 11/6/09. Counsel's supervisor to appear as needed by telephone, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/22/09.(gms, )
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2009. Denying as moot 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. The Court addresses the Motions at Doc. #67 and #68 and advises counsel they were docketed incorrectly and will be re-docketed by the Court to reflect the proper title of the filings. Granting 79 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Defendants will file a response by March 23, 2009, intervenors will file any s upplement to that response by April 14, 2009 and the plaintiff will file any final reply by April 20, 2009. The case will be at issue on April 20, 2009. Docket No. 67 and 68 will be considered at the time of the consideration of the appeal on its merits. Denying as moot 70 Motion for Extension of Time. (Court Reporter Paul Zuckerman.) (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Environmental Coalition et al v. Kempthorne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Society, The
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock the Earth
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Counsel
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wildlife Federation
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Native Ecosystems
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Environmental Coalition
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Mountain Club
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Trout Unlimited
Represented By: James S. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Wisely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie L. Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?