Hawkinson v. Montoya et al
Plaintiff: |
Patrick M. Hawkinson |
Defendant: |
James (I) A. Montoya, James A. Montoya, R. (I) Lynn Keener, R. Lynn Keener, Robert (I) Scranton, Robert Scranton, Estate of Opal Wilson (I) and Estate of Opal Wilson |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv01558 |
Filed: |
July 24, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
Crowley |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward W. Nottingham |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 10, 2010 |
Filing
96
MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiffs Emergency Motion For The Court To Reconsider Its Order 84 and the plaintiffs Motion For Clarification of Courts Order Denying Motion To Reconsider 91 are DENIED as moot in light of the opinion and mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit [94 and 95] in this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/10/2010.(sah, )
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing
90
ORDER. The plaintiffs Supplemented Emergency Motion for the Court To Reconsider Its Order 87 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/19/2010.(sah, )
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing
83
ORDER and Amended Order Dismissing Complaint. The Plaintiffs Motion for the District Court To Reconsider Its Order 62 and Judgment 63 Under Rule 59, F.R.Civ.P. 64 filed 10/02/2009, is GRANTED to the extent the defendant seeks reconsideration o f my order 62 filed 09/16/2009. That based on my reconsideration of my order 62 , Defendant Montoyas Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint with Authorities 22 filed 09/29/2008, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion To Supplement (With Supplemental) To PlaintiffsResponse To Defendants Motion To Dismiss 37 filed 11/07/2008, is GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs Motion To Supplement (With Supplemental) To PlaintiffsResponse To Defendants Motion To Dismiss 37 filed 11/07/2008, is DENIED. Plaintiffs Mo tion for Leave To File Plaintiffs First Amended and Supplemented Prisoner Complaint 41 filed 01/07/2009, is DENIED. Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), the plaintiffs claims for access to the courts and retaliation are DISMISSED. Under 28 U.S.C. 7; 1915A(b)(1), the plaintiffs claims against defendant Robert Scranton are DISMISSED. An AMENDED JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, James A. Montoya and Robert Scranton, and against the plaintiff, Patrick M. Hawkinson, on each of the plaintiffs claims for relief. The defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/02/2010.(sah, )
|
October 20, 2009 |
Filing
70
ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 68 Notice of Appeal by Patrick Hawkinson, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/20/09. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion in district court.(bjrsl, )
|
September 16, 2009 |
Filing
62
ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 57 filed 08/04/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART. Defendant Montoyas Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint with Authorities 22 filed 09/29/2008, is GRANTED. De fendant Montoyas Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint with Authorities 22 filed September 29, 2008, otherwise is DENIED.the Plaintiffs Motion To Supplement (With Supplemental) To Plaintiffs Response To Defendants Motion To Dismiss 37 filed 11/0 7/2008, is DENIED. The Plaintiffs Motion To Supplement (With Supplemental) To Plaintiffs Response To Defendants Motion To Dismiss 37 filed 11/07/2008, is GRANTED. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/16/2009. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave To File Plain tiffs First Amended and Supplemented Prisoner Complaint 41 filed 01/07/2009, is DENIED. Under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), the plaintiffs access to the courts and retaliation claims are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. This case is DISMISSED. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, James A. Montoya and Robert Scranton, and against the plaintiff, Patrick M. Hawkinson. The defendants are AWARDED their costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/16/2009.(sah, )
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing
57
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendant Montoyas Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint with Authorities 22 (the Motion to Dismiss) BE GRANTED that the plaintiffs claim against defendant Montoya be dismisse d as barred by the statute of limitation. That Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement... Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss 37 (the Motion to Supplement) BE DENIED. Thet Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs First Amended and Supplemented Prisoner Complaint 41 (the Motion to Amend) BE DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/04/2009. (sah, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?