Shovan v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Larry Shovan
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv01564
Filed: July 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Insurance Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. A Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice was filed 07/23/2009. This matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 07/24/2009. (sah, )
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 31 parties Amended Stipulated Motion for Protective Order and the draft protective order is REJECTED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/24/2009.(sah, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER denying as WITHDRAWN 27 Defendants Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/11/2009.(sah, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 23 parties Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. The Motion is DENIED and the draft protective order is REJECTED by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/02/2009.(sah, )
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 20 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of the Claims File and for an Extension fo Time to Disclose Experts by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/29/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shovan v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Shovan
Represented By: Brian S. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Alan Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?