Mercado v. Eye Care Center of Northern Colorado, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Lorinda Mercado
Defendant: Eye Care Center of Northern Colorado, P.C. and Resource One
Case Number: 1:2008cv01616
Filed: July 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER for Dismissal. Pursuant to the 25 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss, this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and legal fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/19/10.(gmssl, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 2/16/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/2/2009. (rpmcd)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Calendar Call on 10/2/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/23/09. (jjh, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/29/2009 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 21, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/24/2006. (rpmcd)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: 5 Motion to Dismiss. This civil action is dismissed as to defendant Eye Care Center of Northern Colorado, P.C., and the motion to dismiss of Resource One is denied, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/24/09.(gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercado v. Eye Care Center of Northern Colorado, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorinda Mercado
Represented By: George Case Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eye Care Center of Northern Colorado, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resource One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?