Colorado Environmental Coalition et al v. Office of Legacy Management et al
Plaintiff: Colorado Environmental Coalition, Information Network for Responsible Mining, Center for Native Ecosystems and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Office of Legacy Management and United States Department of Energy
Case Number: 1:2008cv01624
Filed: July 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 - Review of Agency Action -- Environment (Declaration of Purpose)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying 147 Motion to Dissolve the Injunction by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/2/18. A Status Report is due by 2/12/2018. (dkals, )
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying 142 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record with Extra-Record Evidence. Per ECF No. 134 , the Court sets the following merits briefing schedule: DOE shall file its combined motion to dissolve the Injunction and opening brief on the merits of up to 30 pages on or before April 7, 2017; Plaintiffs shall file their response brief of up to 40 pages on or before May 19, 2017; DOE may file its reply brief of up to 30 pages (or up to 35 pages if Plaintiffs' response brief includes an argument to consider extra-record evidence) on or before June 19, 2017. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/07/2017. (cthom, )
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying 124 Defendant's Motion to Dissolve the Injunction. DOEs Motion to Dissolve the Injunction 124 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; The parties shall prepare and submit an abbreviated Joint Case Management Plan (Plan) comprising Parts 6, 9, and 10 of this Districts template, by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/13/2016.(cthom, )
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 119 Motion to Reopen Case, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/06/2015.(cthom, )
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Defendants Motion for Reconsideration ECF No. 9 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Defendants Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED in so far as the Courts injunction will be amended to allow Defendants; other federal, state, or local g overnmental agencies; and/or the lessees to conduct only those activities on ULMP lands that are absolutely necessary; In all other respects, Defendants Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED; After entry of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall again administratively CLOSE this action, subject to the Courts continuing jurisdiction to enforce full compliance with this Order, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/27/2012.(ervsl, )
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 OPINION AND ORDER, This matter shall be administratively CLOSED subject to the Courts continuing jurisdiction to enforce full compliance with this Order; and Defendants Motion to Strike Extra-Record Materials 91 is DENIED. (See PDF for Details) by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/18/2011. (ervsl, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report, Status Report due by 2/23/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/2011. (erv, )
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Plaintiffs Unopposed First Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is accepted for filing. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/26/2010.(erv, )
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER: Vacating Telephonic Status Conference set 2/19/2010 08:30 AM. Scheduling Conference is set for 2/23/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order consistent with Chief Judge Daniel's Order 41 shall be filed on or before 2/18/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/2010. (mjwcd )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re: 27 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. For the reasons outlined above, the Minute Order of March 9, 2009, filed by Magistrate Judge Watanabe is AFFIRMED IN PART AND REJECTED IN PART. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery is now GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART consistent with this Order. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/14/2010. (erv, )
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MMINUTE ORDER denying 21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/9/09.(erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Environmental Coalition et al v. Office of Legacy Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Environmental Coalition
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Information Network for Responsible Mining
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Native Ecosystems
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Legacy Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?