Estate of Elias Santistevan et al v. Denver, Colorado, The City and County of et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Elias Santistevan, Estate of Deion Santistevan, Chanell (I) Santistevan and Chanell Santistevan
Defendant: Denver, Colorado, The City and County of, Gerald (I) R. Whitman and Gerald R. Whitman
Case Number: 1:2008cv01669
Filed: August 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Overruling Objections, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/19/10.(lyg, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. Defendants City and County of Denver and Gerald R. Whitmans Motion To Reconsider Clerks Ruling as to Defendants Bill of Costs 77 filed 11/19/2009, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/01/2010.(sah, )
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. Defendants City and County of Denver and Gerald R. Whitmans Combined Motion and Brief for Summary Judgment 52 filed 09/08/2009, is GRANTED. Defendants City and County of Denver and Gerald R. Whitmans Unopposed Motion To Continue Trial and Vacate Final Trial Preparation Conference 58 filed 09/25/2009, is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs claims against all defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Judgment SHALL ENTER in favor of defendants, The City and County of Denver, Colorado, Chief o f Police Gerald R. Whitman, in his individual and official capacity, and John Does 1-30, Members of the S.W.A.T. Unit, Law Enforcement Officers, and Detectives Employed by the Denver Police Department, each in his or her individual and official capac ity, and against plaintiffs, the Estate of Deion Santistevan, By Chanell Santistevan as Personal Representative, and Chanell Santistevan, Individually as Parent of Deion Santistevan, as to all claims for relief and causes of action asserted in this a ction. The Trial Preparation Conference currently scheduled for Friday, 10/16/2009, at 1:30 p.m., as well as the trial, currently scheduled to commence on 11/02/2009, are VACATED. Defendants are AWARDED their costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/8/2009.(sah, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER Settlement Conference set for 10/13/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Out-of-state parties and counsel will be permitted to attend the settlement conference telephonically; In state parties and counsel shall appear in person, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/04/2009. (mjwcd )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. The Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs 37 filed 03/12/2009, isGRANTED. Plaintiffs, Elias Santistevan, Yariah Santistevan and Rudolph F.Santistevan, and their concomitant claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs, Elias Santistevan, Yariah Santistevan and Rudolph F. Santistevan, are DROPPED as parties to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/12/2009.(sah, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 02/06/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Elias Santistevan et al v. Denver, Colorado, The City and County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Elias Santistevan
Represented By: Anthony Viorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Deion Santistevan
Represented By: Anthony Viorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanell (I) Santistevan
Represented By: Anthony Viorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanell Santistevan
Represented By: Anthony Viorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver, Colorado, The City and County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald (I) R. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald R. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?