Chani v. AMPCO System Parking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fekadu Alemu Chani
Defendant: AMPCO System Parking, Inc., Hirut Yigletu, International Union of the United Mine Workers of America AFL-CIO and United Mine Workers of America AFL-CIO, Local Union 8431
Case Number: 1:2008cv01782
Filed: August 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000no Job Discrimination (National Origin)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second-Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint attached to the motion (Doc. No. 42-2), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/13/09.(wjc, )
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE-SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/1/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/6/09. (kmtcd)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER granting 51 Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference. The 07/17/09 settlement conference is vacated. The parties shall place a conference call to chambers no later than 5:00 p.m. on 07/02/2009 in order to reschedule the settlement conference, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/25/09.(wjc, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Unopposed Request for Status Conference, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/06/09.(wjc, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Re-Setting Settlement Conference for 5/12/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/12/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chani v. AMPCO System Parking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fekadu Alemu Chani
Represented By: Stuart A. Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMPCO System Parking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirut Yigletu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of the United Mine Workers of America AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Mine Workers of America AFL-CIO, Local Union 8431
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?