Daugherty et al v. Bissell
Plaintiff: Anne Daugherty and Brian Daugherty
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Bissell
Case Number: 1:2008cv01931
Filed: September 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A) (ii), with each party to pay his, her or its own costs and attorney fees and costs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/25/2010. (erv, )
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER that the Motion to Modify Scheduling Order is Granted in Part and Denied in Part as set in this Order by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/23/10. (jjh, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint and Join Additional Defendants. The Amended Complaint is accepted for filing, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/03/2009.(wjc, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re: granting 34 Unopposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Order on Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. The deadline to designate non-parties at fault is extended, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing Defendants Design ation of Non-Parties [Doc. # 31]. The case schedule is modified to the following extent, Discovery due by 7/23/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2010. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/23/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/23/09. (bnbcd, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: re: denying 30 The defendants Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/1/09.(bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daugherty et al v. Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Daugherty
Represented By: Kevin Sean Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Daugherty
Represented By: Kevin Sean Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?