Beecher v. Greeley, Town of et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Beecher
Defendant: Greeley, Town of, Brian Cobb and Ryan Templeman
Case Number: 1:2008cv01968
Filed: September 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the 48 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/14/09. (ebs, )
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS COBB AND TEMPLEMAN pursuant to the 46 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of Officer Brian Cobb and Officer Ryan Templeman in Their Individual and Official Capacities. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims asserted in this matter against defendants Brian Cobb and Ryan Templeman, in their individual and official capacities, are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/6/09. (ebs, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/2/2009. Granting 37 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (doc #37- 2) is accepted as of today's date. Withdrawing without prejudice 2 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6) and Qualified Immunity. Settlement Conference set for 6/16/2009 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe.) (ebs, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Lydia M. Tate is relieved of any further representation of Plaintiff in this matter, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/26/09.(ebs, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/18/09. (ebs, )
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1A 26 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/13/09.(ebs, )
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2009 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Ordered: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 20 is Denied without prejudice. (Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beecher v. Greeley, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Beecher
Represented By: Lydia Marie Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greeley, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Templeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?