Ajaj v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Ahmed Mohammad Ajaj
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons, Ron Wiley, Robert A. Hood, Tomas Gomez, M. Dunlap, M. Merrill, Keith Powley, Vigle, Harvey Church, John Shartle, John Bradford, Lisa Braren, J. D. Walters, Lawrence L. Leyba, Michael K. Nalley, Christopher B. Synsvoll and David Johnson
Case Number: 1:2008cv02006
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 490 AMENDED ORDER. The Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) 388 is GRANTED. The Motion for Summary Judgment 448 is GRANTED. The Motion for Order 483 is DENIED. All other pending motions [ 393, 405, 406, 407, 408, 409, 412, 413, 430, 439, 465, 466, 471, 473, 478, 479] are DENIED as MOOT. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/27/2012. (sahsl, )
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER. The Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) 388 is GRANTED. The Motion for Summary Judgment 448 is GRANTED. The Motion for Order 483 is DENIED. All other pending motions [ 393, 405, 406, 407, 408, 409, 412, 413, 430, 439, 448, 465, 466, 471, 473, 478, 479] are DENIED as MOOT. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/26/2012.(sah, )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER granting 485 Motion to Stay Briefing on Docket Numbers 473 and 478 . By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/23/2012.(sah, )
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MINUTE ORDER Granting 469 Defendants Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiffs Additional Motion to Compel. The following motions as listed below in paragraphs 1-3, inclusive, are STAYED until ruling by District Judge R. Brooke Jackson on (1) Defenda nts United States of Americas and the Federal Bureau of Prisons Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) docket no. 388 and (2) Defendant Tomas Gomezs Motion for Summary Judgment docket no. 448 ; The Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiffs Motions to Compel docket nos. 405 , 406 , 407 , 408 , 409 , 412 , 413 , 439 , and 466 ; The Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Expert 430 ; It is FURTHER ORDERED that a Status Conference is set before Magistrate Judge Watanabe on April 26, 2012, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A-502, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, 80294, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/1/2012.(ervsl, )
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting Defendants' 458 Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motions to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/31/12.(lsw, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 447 MINUTE ORDER denying 440 Plaintiff's Request that the Court Issue Scheduling Order for Filing Motions; granting 441 Plaintiffs Motion for an Additional 10" Days; granting 444 The United States of America's and the Federal B ureau of Prisons' Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. The deadline for defendants United States of America and Federal Bureau of Prisons to file dispositive motions is extended to 20 days after a ruling on their Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/4/12.(lsw, )
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER denying 357 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; denying 379 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; denying 392 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; denying 238 Motion for Prelimin ary Injunction; denying 241 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 245 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 247 Motion for Order; denying as moot 250 Motion for Order; denying 270 Plaintiff's Motion; affirming Report and Recommendations 282 ; denying 302 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/9/11.(lsw, )
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER denying 278 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's motions 317 , 318 , 319 , 328 , 272 , 294 , 293 , 285 , 289 , 290 , 291 , 292 , 312 are also denied, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/6/11.(gmssl, )
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MINUTE ORDER granting 389 Motion for Leave of Court to Serve Additional Interrogatories; denying 384 Motion to Set New Deadline; granting 385 Motion for Leave. Discovery due by 12/30/2011 for the limited purpose, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/16/11. (lsw, )
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting 381 Motion for Clarification and to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/31/2011.(mjwcd)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER Regarding Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Request for an Order Directing the Defendant BOP to Allow Him to Obtain Affidavits and Other Evidence from Other Inmates in Support of His Remaining Claims. Granting in part and denying in part [3 51] Motion for Order. The subject motion is GRANTED as to inmates Edgar Nelson Pitts, El Sayyd Nossair, A. Abdelgani, and F. Abdelgani. The remainder of the motion concerning the other inmates is DENIED. That Defendant BOPs Legal Department at ADX Florence, Colorado, shall send a letter to inmates Edgar Nelson Pitts, El Sayyd Nossair, A. Abdelgani, and F. Abdelgani. That this court adopts those procedures as outlined in the Order (docket no. [366-2]). That each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/3/11.(lsw, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER denying 350 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Inmate Mohammad Amin Salameh, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/28/2011.(mjwcd)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting 313 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiffs Motion for Order to be Allowed to Take Telephonic Depositions or Video Conference Depositions of the Defendants and Witnesses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(2)(3) and that this Honorable Court take Judicial Notice of the Attached Cases in Deciding this Motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/15/11.(gmssl, )
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 309 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/7/11. (msksec, )
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTE ORDER denying 296 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Submit Documents Contains Allegations Referred to in His Third Amended Complaint and Upon Which He Relied in Bringing His Suit and Such Documents Either Defendants Possessed or Knew About that Explaining How Each Defendant Personally Participated in the Violations or His Rights and Highly Relevant to His Motion for Reconsideration of the March 10, 2011 Opinion and Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/12/2011.(mjwcd)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 249 Defendants' Motion to Stay all Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion for Protective Order. Status Conference set for 4/26/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/31/11.(gmssl, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 222 Plaintiff's Motion for An Order Directing Defendant "BOP" to Allow Him to Take Telephone Depositions of the Defendants by Sound Recording Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(2)(3), by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/25/2010.(mjwcd)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Granting 207 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Take Deposition, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/8/2010. (mjwcd)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 187 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Directing Defendant BOP to Allow Plaintiff to Make Calls to Experts and Witnesses, etc. Clerk to make a good faith effort to try to secure pro bono counsel for plaintiff. Denying 189 Plaintiff's Motion that All Future Mail from Defendants' Attorney to Plaintiff Fully Comply with 28 C.F.R. § 540.19 Requirements, etc; denying 190 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Directing Defendant BOP to Allow Him Confer with, Contact and Gather Evidence and Declarations, etc., by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/15/10.(gmssl, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MINUTE ORDER granting 137 Plaintiff's Motion to File Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 and 21. The tendered 162 Third Amended Complaint is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/13/2010.(wjc, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 136 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Directing BOP to Provide Him Medical Experts' List and to Allow Him to Confer with and Call Experts; denying without prejudice 144 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Directing BOP to Disclose the Current Address for Defendant Nafziger and Dunlap to Enable Service or in the Alternative Their Addresses be Disclosed Through the Other Active Cases Against Them in this Court or Additional Time be Given to Plaintiff to Obtain Their Addresses [sic] by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/11/2010.(wjc, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference / Show Cause Hearing held on 2/18/2010. Order to Show Cause 123 is deemed satisfied and is vacated.Defendants shall have to 3/2/2010 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to File Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15 and 21 137 . Deadline for plaintiff to file Third Amended Complaint is 3/19/2010.Granting 130 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Deadline for Filing Certificate of Review for Plaintiffs Medical Claims Due to Circumstances Beyond His Control. Granting 131 Plaintiffs Motion to Stay the Discovery until He Files His Third Ameded [Sic] Complaint and until the BOP Release [Sic] to Him His Legal Mate rials and Allows Him to Gather Evidence and Declarations.Granting 132 Plaintiffs Second Motion to Allow Service of Defendants Through the Courts Electronic Case Filing (ECF) and to Relieve Plaintiff from Obligation of Serving Defense Counsel with H is Pleadings and Correspondence with the Court. See, e.g., Ajaj V. Communications Data Services, et al., 4:07-cv-00478-REL-RAW, (Dkt Document No. 52, U.S. District Court for Southern District of Iowa). Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/15/2010. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER granting 83 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay the Deadline for Plaintiff to File a Certificate of Review for a period of 90 Days; denying without prejudice 84 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Directing the Defendant B.O.P . to Allow Him to Confer Via Telephone Calls with Experts' [sic] Witnesses and to Provide Him With Telephone Numbers of Witnesses. Plaintiff may renew this motion once the stay of discovery is lifted, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/05/2009.(wjc, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay the Deadlines in the Scheduling Order and Discovery for 90 Days. Discovery in this case is STAYED until 12/24/2009. Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiffs 74 Motion for Order is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE noting that this court has granted the Defendants 72 Unopposed Motion to Stay the Deadlines in the Scheduling Order and Discovery for 90 Days. The Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff may renew this motion once the stay of discovery is lifted. Status Conference set for 1/19/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. The Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff shall participate at the Status Conference by telephone. The Plaintiffs case manager shall mak e the appropriate arrangements to ensure the availability of the Plaintiff for this conference and initiate the conference call on 01/19/2010 at 9:00 AM (Mountain Time). The parties shall use case number 08-cv-02006-MSK-MJW. The Clerk of the Court shall add the Case Manager of Ahmed Mohammad Ajaj as an interested party to the manual notification for this case, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/24/09.(wjc, )
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER of Recusal. Clerk to assign another Magistrate Judge to this case, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/18/09. (gms, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 62 Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Directing Defendant Wiley to Allow Him Access to His Stored Legal Materials That [sic] Relevant to This Case and Necessary for Preparing His Second Amended Complaint Scheduled to be Fil ed July 16, 2009; granting 64 Plaintiffs Second Motion for an Additional 30" Days to File an Amended Complaint Due to Special Circumstances Beyond His Control. Plaintiff shall file his Second Amended Complaint on or before 08/14/2009, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/27/09.(wjc, )
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 51 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and for Protective Order; granting 56 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay All Deadlines and to Issue New Scheduling Order. Discovery is stayed until Plaintiff files a second amended complaint, or until 07/16/2009, whichever occurs first, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/17/09.(wjc, )
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER denying 45 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow Service of Defendants Through ECF and to Relieve Him from Obligation of Serving Defense Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/11/09.(wjc, )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order that Any Future Mail from the Court and Defendants' Attorney to Plaintiff Fully Comply with 28 C.F.R. 540.19 Requirement, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/28/09.(wjc, )
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/17/09. (msksec, ) Modified on 4/21/2009 to add text date (wjc, ).
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/26/09. (mskcd)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Assigning Case. Ordered that this case shall be assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1 and to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/14/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajaj v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Mohammad Ajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Powley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shartle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Braren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence L. Leyba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Nalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher B. Synsvoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?