Jones v. Hartley et al
Petitioner: Fredrick L. Jones
Respondent: Steve Hartley and John Suthers
Case Number: 1:2008cv02007
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Returning State Court Record. ORDERED that the Clerk shall return the State Court Record, signed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 2/9/11. (lyg, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED re 32 Notice of Appeal filed by Fredrick Jones, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/02/09. (bjrsl, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied. Case is dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 10/20/09. (gmssl, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER For State Court Record. On or before 7/23/09 Clerk of Combined Court for El Paso County to provide the original written record for 87CR2730. Clerk to serve a copy of this order on the Clerk of the Combined Court for El Paso County by fax and by regular mail, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 6/23/09. (gmssl, )
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the 17 Special Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge is vacated, and the reference is withdrawn, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 04/07/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hartley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fredrick L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?