St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company v. Alstom Power, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Alstom Power, Inc., TIC-The Industrial Company and Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv02139
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Insurance Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER. A Stipulation for Dismissal of All Claims and Entire Action, With Prejudice was filed on 7/11/2011. This matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/13/2011. (sah, )
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 54(b). By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/7/2011. (sah, )
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER. Defendant Zurich American Insurance Companys (Zurich) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed 06/01/2010 93 is DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/08/2010.(sah, )
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER. Plaintiff St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Companys Motion for Summary Judgment, filed 06/01/2010 94 is GRANTED. Plaintiff St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Companys Motion for Summary Judgment, filed 06/01/2010 94 is GRANTED. Judgme nt shall enter in favor of St. Paul and against Alstom with costs awarded to St. Paul. St. Pauls Motion to Strike Portions of Alstoms Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Against St. Paul as to Liability and Motion to Submit Sur- Reply 114 is DENIED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 08/31/2010.(sah, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice (Stipulation) submitted by Plaintiff St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company (St. Paul), Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff TIC-The Industrial Company (TIC), and Defendant Zurich American Insurance Com pany (Zurich),is Granted. Claims St. Paul has asserted against Zurich and the counterclaims Zurich has asserted against St. Paul shall relate only to the issue of St. Pauls and/or Zurichs defense and/or indemnity obligations relating to Alstom. Each party agrees to pay its own costs and attorneys fees. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 08/04/2010. (sah, )
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/24/2010. (klmcd, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER granting 88 Defendant Zurich American Insurance Companys Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 06/29/2010 at 9:30 a.m. is vacated and RESET to 08/23/2010 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. The parties shall submit their proposed pretrial order by 08/16/2010. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/27/2010.(sah, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Defendant Zurich American Insurance Companys Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Claimants' Expert Disclosure Deadline is 04/01/2010. Defendants' Expert Disclosure Deadline is 04/15/2010. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 05/03/2010. Discovery Cut-Off is 05/17/2010. Dispositive Motions Deadline is 06/01/2010. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/14/2010.(sah, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Claimants Expert Disclosure Deadline 02/01/2010. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline 02/15/2010. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline 03/01/2010. Discovery Cut-Off 03/ 30/2010. Dispositive Motions Deadline 04/30/2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court sua sponte vacates the Final Pretrial Conference set for 03/29/20/10 at 9:30 a.m. and RESETS it to 06/29/2010 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-204. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/22/2009(sah, )
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 37 Alstoms Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 04/21/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company v. Alstom Power, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Nancy L. Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alstom Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIC-The Industrial Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?