September 12, 2011 |
Filing
155
ORDER. Order of Reference 138 is withdrawn. Granting 137 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Trial Preparation Conference and Trial are vacated. Defendants are awarded costs, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/12/11.(gmssl, )
|
April 5, 2011 |
Filing
134
ORDER granting 132 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 118 is amended. Discovery due by 5/27/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set 6/24/2011 is vacated. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/5/2011.(mjwcd)
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing
129
ORDER. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 127 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/14/2011.(sah, )
|
January 13, 2011 |
Filing
124
ORDER granting 122 Parties' Stipulated Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 1/21/2011 at 1:00 PM is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/13/11.(mnf, )
|
November 18, 2010 |
Filing
116
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/18/10. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/16/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 10/3/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing
105
ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/08/2010. (sah, )
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
80
MINUTE ORDER granting 74 Defendants Motion to Strike Amended Complaint. The Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff shall file with the court on or before 09/18/2009 either: (1) a new Second Amended Complaint consistent with Judge Blackburns Order 70 , or (2) inform this court whether he intends on proceeding with the Amended Complaint 71 as the operative pleading in this case by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/04/2009.(sah, )
|
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
78
MINUTE ORDER denying 76 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; The Declaration of Plaintiff docketed as a motion is denied inasmuch as plaintiff does not seek relief from the court in that document, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/02/2009.(mjwcd )
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing
72
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT SHAD DRAPER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/19/2009. (sah, )
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
70
ORDER APPROVED AND ADOPTED 68 Report and Recommendations. granting in part and denying in part 48 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Add Sergeant Shad Draper as a Defendant; T hat defendant, Aristedes W. Zavaras, is DROPPED as a named party defendant to this action, and the case caption is AMENDED accordingly; That plaintiff SHALL FILE an amended complaint in accordance with this Order Adopting Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge on or before September 11, 2009 by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/10/09.(erv, )
|
July 10, 2009 |
Filing
68
RECOMMENDATION. It is recommended that defendants Motion to Dismiss 48 be granted in part and denied in part. More specifically, it is recommended that plaintiffs claim against defendant Zavaras be dismissed. In all other respects, it is recommende d that the motion be denied and that plaintiffs Motion to Add Sergeant Shad Draper as a Defendant 52 be granted in part and denied in part. More specifically, it is recommended that the plaintiff be permitted to amend his Prisoner Complaint to include Draper as a defendant with respect to the claim contained in Docket No. 52 at 1, 2. In all other respects, it is recommended that the motion be denied. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/10/2009. (sah, )
|
April 8, 2009 |
Filing
63
MINUTE ORDER denying 61 plaintiffs Motion for Court Order to Compel Defendants to Produce Discovery or in the Alternative for Preliminary Scheduling Conference. No discovery shall be conducted by the parties without court order until after the Rule 16 Conference is held by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/08/2009.(sah, )
|
February 24, 2009 |
Filing
54
ORDER. The magistrate judges Recommendation on Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 20) 43 filed 01/23/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. The objections stated in Plaintiffs Objection to Recommendation on Plaintiffs Motion f or a Temporary Restraining Order 47 filed 01/30/2009 are OVERRULED. Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order contained in his Emergancy (sic) Declaration of Plaintiff of November 18th 2008 20 filed 12/1/2008 is DENIED by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/24/2009.(sah, )
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing
45
ORDER Directing Service Upon Defendant Aristedes W. Zavaras. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/26/2009. (sah, )
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing
44
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 40 plaintiffs Motion to Amend Testimony to be Used in All Aspects of the Instant Case by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/23/2009.(sah, )
|