C. v. Thompson R2-J School District
Plaintiff: Robert C.
Defendant: Thompson R2-J School District
Case Number: 1:2008cv02227
Filed: October 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 20:1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay his or its own attorneys fees and costs. by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/6/2011.(ervsl, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. The parties are directed to confer and to file, on or before 2/23/2011, a Joint Status Report. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/2011. (sah, )
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference. The Stipulated 33 Motion to Vacate the Settlement Conference is granted and the Settlement Conference scheduled for 04/28/09 is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/22/09.(wjc, )
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion for Designation of Record and Certificate of Compliance with ECF H.6. Conventionally Submitted Materials. The Office of Administrative Courts shall submit the Record on Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/20/09.(wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. v. Thompson R2-J School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C.
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson R2-J School District
Represented By: William Stuart Stuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?