Griego et al v. Chandler-Bey et al
Plaintiff: Howard Griego, Paul Chandler-Bey and Henry Dominguez
Defendant: Barton Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02325
Filed: October 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER. The Motion to Withdraw 71 is GRANTED. George C. Price of the Law Offices of George C. Price is allowed to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs herein. Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by Joseph G. Webb and Marc H. Schtul of the law firm Webb & Schtul, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/4/10.(ltbcd, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Directed to All Claims Asserted by Plaintiff Dominguez, filed 10/23/2009 23 is GRANTED. All claims filed by Plaintiff Henry Dominguez are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with costs awarded to Defendant. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/19/2010.(sah, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. The proposed final pretrial order is REFUSED. The parties shall submit a revised proposed final pretrial order, on or before 02/02/2010. A supplemental final pretrial conference is set for 02/05/2010, at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom 401. A settlement conference will be held on 04/12/2010 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 401. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/14/2010. (sah, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER.A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 3/9/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/06/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griego et al v. Chandler-Bey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Griego
Represented By: George Case Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Chandler-Bey
Represented By: George Case Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Dominguez
Represented By: George Case Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?