Kincade v. Centura Health Corporation
Plaintiff: Roger Kincade
Defendant: Centura Health Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv02329
Filed: October 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER of DISMISSAL. Stipulation of Dismissal is made an order of the Court. Action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/3/09. (gmssl, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Answer to Defendant'sCounterclaims attached thereto is accepted for filing, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/6/2009.(rpmcd)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2009. Denying 41 Motion for Sanctions; Denying 67 Motion for Protective Order; Granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Compel; Granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Strike. Discovery due by 12/4/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2010.). (FTR- Debra Brown) (kmtcd)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Denying 99 Plaintiff's Sealed Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/23/2009.(rpmcd)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 80 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Defendants 79 Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/10/2009.(rpmcd)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Vacating Calendar Call and for Referral of 55 Motion for Extension Of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Calendar call for October 2, 2009, is vacated as to this civil action. Defendant's motion for extension of time to file dispositive motions is referred to Magistrate Judge Tafoya for a ruling. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/9/2009. (rpmcd)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER for Calendar Call on 10/2/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/23/09. (jjh, )(jjh, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to Comply with D.C. COLO.LCivR 7.2. Ordered that in all court filings, counsel shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under seal based on the Protective Order by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 06/16/09. (jjh, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on Plaintiff's 13 MOTION for Protective Order re: 19 Response. On or before June 15, 2009, the parties shall submit a stipulated protective order or indicate what matters are in dispute. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/5/2009. (rpmcd)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended ORDER re: 8 Order Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/20/2009 at 11:30 AM in Conference, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/14/2009. (Amended as to date/year order signed).(rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kincade v. Centura Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Kincade
Represented By: Karen Virginia Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centura Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?